Simpson et al v. Nissan of North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ariel Simpson, Dominique Brogden, Tara Martins, Gregory Swann, Danielle Romanoff and Perry Royster
Defendant: Nissan of North America, Inc. and Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00747
Filed: September 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #1 AND CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Considering the Joint Motion of Plaintiffs and Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. ("NNA") to continue the initial case management conference and extend the time for NNA to respond to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint, the Court grants the motion #10 as follows: The time for Defendant NNA to respond to the Class Action Complaint is extended to January 31, 2023. It is further ORDERED that the initial case management conference is RESET for February 13, 2023 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/16/2022. (ln)
November 16, 2022 Reset Hearing: The Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 2/13/2023 at 3:00 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (ln)
November 14, 2022 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint and to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Dominique Brogden, Tara Martins, Danielle Romanoff, Perry Royster, Ariel Simpson, Gregory Swann. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Stranch, James) Modified on 11/15/2022 (ln). Added MOTION to Continue on 11/15/2022 (ln).
November 10, 2022 TX State Bar status verified as active for E. Paul Cauley, Jr not admitted to this court - Local counsel required. (ln)
November 10, 2022 NOTICE TO COUNSEL E. Paul Cauley, Jr: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 12/1/2022. (ln)
November 10, 2022 NOTICE TO COUNSEL E. Paul Cauley, Jr: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 12/1/2022. (ln)
November 8, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Danielle Romanoff, Dominique Brogden, Ariel Simpson, Tara Martins, Gregory Swann, Perry Royster. Nissan of North America, Inc. waiver sent on 10/27/2022. (Stranch, James)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 and #7 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Benjamin Donahue and Mark Greenstone to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 10/05/2022. (lh)
October 3, 2022 ME State Bar status verified as active for Benjamin Newton Donahue not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ln)
September 30, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Mark Greenstone to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3676737) by Dominique Brogden, Tara Martins, Danielle Romanoff, Perry Royster, Ariel Simpson, Gregory Swann. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Stranch, James)
September 30, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Benjamin Donahue to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3676734) by Dominique Brogden, Tara Martins, Perry Royster, Ariel Simpson, Gregory Swann. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Stranch, James)
September 26, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/22/2022 at 1:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (ln)
September 26, 2022 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan of North America, Inc. Service copies will be picked up by counsel at the Intake Window between 8:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m. (ln)
September 26, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
September 26, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
September 26, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Anthony A. Orlandi, James Gerard Stranch, IV, Benjamin A. Gastel admitted to this court. (ln)
September 26, 2022 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Mark Greenstone, Benjamin Donahue: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/17/2022. (ln)
September 26, 2022 CA State Bar status verified as active for Mark Greenstone not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ln)
September 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan of North America, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3672915) filed by Danielle Romanoff, Dominique Brogden, Ariel Simpson, Tara Martins, Gregory Swann, Perry Royster. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson et al v. Nissan of North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariel Simpson
Represented By: Mark Greenstone
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Benjamin Donahue
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Benjamin Newton Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique Brogden
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Benjamin Donahue
Represented By: Mark Greenstone
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Benjamin Newton Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Martins
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Benjamin Donahue
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: Mark Greenstone
Represented By: Benjamin Newton Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Swann
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Benjamin Donahue
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Mark Greenstone
Represented By: Benjamin Newton Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Romanoff
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Benjamin Donahue
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Mark Greenstone
Represented By: Benjamin Newton Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Royster
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: Benjamin Donahue
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Mark Greenstone
Represented By: Benjamin Newton Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan of North America, Inc.
Represented By: E. Paul Cauley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?