Johnson v. Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alexander Johnson
Defendant: Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00748
Filed: September 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2022 Filing 11 ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re: #10 Order Dismissing Case. (kc)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's "Notice of Dismissal" #9 filed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The Court acknowledges that this action has been DISMISSED with prejudice, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. This Order shall constitute final judgment for purposes of Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/21/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
October 20, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Alexander Johnson (Biesecker, Kyle)
October 3, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Alexander Johnson. Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. served on 9/29/2022. (Biesecker, Kyle)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/27/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
September 26, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 11/7/2022 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ln)
September 26, 2022 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ln)
September 26, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
September 26, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
September 26, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Frederick Biesecker on behalf of Alexander Johnson. (ln)
September 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3673165) filed by Alexander Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)
September 26, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Kyle Frederick Biesecker admitted to this court. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Johnson
Represented By: Kyle Frederick Biesecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?