Jarrell et al v. Roy Blackwell Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jack Jarrell, Michael Pfieffer and Iron Workers Tennessee Valley and Vicinity Annuity Fund
Defendant: Roy Blackwell Enterprises, Inc. and Roy Blackwell
Case Number: 3:2022cv00750
Filed: September 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Cancel Initial Case Management Conference. The Initial Case Management Conference will be reset if necessary following a ruling on the motion for default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/24/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
October 21, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Cancel Initial Case Management Conference by Iron Workers Tennessee Valley and Vicinity Annuity Fund, Jack Jarrell, Michael Pfieffer. (Jennings, R.)
October 21, 2022 Filing 10 DECLARATION of R. Jan Jennings filed by Iron Workers Tennessee Valley and Vicinity Annuity Fund, Jack Jarrell, Michael Pfieffer re: #9 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Roy Blackwell, Roy Blackwell Enterprises, Inc.. (Jennings, R.)
October 21, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Roy Blackwell, Roy Blackwell Enterprises, Inc. by Michael Pfieffer, Jack Jarrell, Iron Workers Tennessee Valley and Vicinity Annuity Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Tennessee Secretary of State Business Filing Information)(Jennings, R.)
October 5, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael Pfieffer, Jack Jarrell, Iron Workers Tennessee Valley and Vicinity Annuity Fund. Roy Blackwell served on 9/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Craig Yarbrough regarding non-military service, age and competency)(Jennings, R.)
October 5, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael Pfieffer, Jack Jarrell, Iron Workers Tennessee Valley and Vicinity Annuity Fund. Roy Blackwell Enterprises, Inc. served on 9/29/2022. (Jennings, R.)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/27/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
September 27, 2022 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Roy Blackwell, Roy Blackwell Enterprises, Inc. (Service packet returned to counsel by regular mail.) (kc)
September 27, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 11/22/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (kc)
September 27, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
September 27, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
September 27, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for R. Jan Jennings, Karla M. Campbell admitted to this court. (kc)
September 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Roy Blackwell, Roy Blackwell Enterprises, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3673596), filed by Michael Pfieffer, Jack Jarrell, Iron Workers Tennessee Valley and Vicinity Annuity Fund. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jarrell et al v. Roy Blackwell Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Jarrell
Represented By: Karla M. Campbell
Represented By: R. Jan Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Pfieffer
Represented By: Karla M. Campbell
Represented By: R. Jan Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iron Workers Tennessee Valley and Vicinity Annuity Fund
Represented By: Karla M. Campbell
Represented By: R. Jan Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Blackwell Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?