Busler et al v. Nissan North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Abigail Busler, Susanne Hanes, Carl Kirksey, Marueen Love, Taylor Simms, Sean Chambers and Chantel Young
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00769
Filed: September 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Considering the Joint Motion #25 of Plaintiffs and Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. ("NNA") to continue the initial case management conference and extend the time for NNA to respond to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint, the Court grants the motion as follows: The time for Defendant NNA to respond to the Class Action Complaint is extended to January 16, 2023. It is further ORDERED that the initial case management conference is RESET for January 23, 2023 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/15/2022. (mg)
November 14, 2022 Filing 25 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and NNA Answer Deadline by Abigail Busler, Sean Chambers, Susanne Hanes, Carl Kirksey, Marueen Love, Taylor Simms, Chantel Young. (Attachments: #1 Attachment [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint and Continuing Initial Case Management Conference)(Coleman, Gregory)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Mitchell Breit to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 11/14/2022. (lh)
November 9, 2022 Filing 23 Amended MOTION for attorney Mitchell Breit to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee previously paid, see Docket Entry No. #10 ) by Abigail Busler, Sean Chambers, Susanne Hanes, Carl Kirksey, Marueen Love, Taylor Simms, Chantel Young. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Coleman, Gregory) Modified on 11/10/2022 (mg).
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Barbara McDonald to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 10/31/2022. (lh)
October 20, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for attorney Barbara McDonald to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3689639) by Abigail Busler, Sean Chambers, Susanne Hanes, Carl Kirksey, Marueen Love, Taylor Simms, Chantel Young. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Cisneros, Norberto)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Norberto J. Cisneros to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 10/19/2022. (lh)
October 13, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for attorney Norberto J. Cisneros to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3684243) by Abigail Busler, Sean Chambers, Susanne Hanes, Carl Kirksey, Marueen Love, Taylor Simms, Chantel Young. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Cisneros, Norberto)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 , #13 , #14 , #15 , #16 , and #17 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Jeffrey L. Osterwise, Lawrence Deutsch, Russell D. Paul, Cody R. Padgett, Laura E. Goolsby, and Tarek H. Zohdy to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 10/11/2022. (lh)
October 11, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for attorney Tarek H. Zohdy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3682589) by Abigail Busler, Sean Chambers, Susanne Hanes, Carl Kirksey, Marueen Love, Taylor Simms, Chantel Young. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Coleman, Gregory)
October 11, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for attorney Laura E. Goolsby to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3682584) by Abigail Busler, Sean Chambers, Susanne Hanes, Carl Kirksey, Marueen Love, Taylor Simms, Chantel Young. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Coleman, Gregory)
October 11, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Cody R. Padgett to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3682581) by Abigail Busler, Sean Chambers, Susanne Hanes, Carl Kirksey, Marueen Love, Taylor Simms, Chantel Young. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Coleman, Gregory)
October 11, 2022 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#10 : The PHV motion must be accompanied by a Certificate of Good Standing from a United States District Court or a United States appellate court. The certificate shall be filed within 10 days. (mg)
October 7, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for attorney Russell D. Paul to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3681108) by Abigail Busler, Sean Chambers, Susanne Hanes, Carl Kirksey, Marueen Love, Taylor Simms, Chantel Young. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Coleman, Gregory)
October 7, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Lawrence Deutsch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3681102) by Abigail Busler, Sean Chambers, Susanne Hanes, Carl Kirksey, Marueen Love, Taylor Simms, Chantel Young. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Coleman, Gregory)
October 7, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Jeffrey L. Osterwise to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3681093) by Abigail Busler, Sean Chambers, Susanne Hanes, Carl Kirksey, Marueen Love, Taylor Simms, Chantel Young. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Coleman, Gregory)
October 7, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sean Chambers, Carl Kirksey, Abigail Busler, Marueen Love, Chantel Young, Taylor Simms, Susanne Hanes. Nissan North America, Inc. waiver sent on 10/5/2022. (Coleman, Gregory)
October 6, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Mitchell Breit to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3680199) by Abigail Busler, Sean Chambers, Susanne Hanes, Carl Kirksey, Marueen Love, Taylor Simms, Chantel Young. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Coleman, Gregory)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 , #7 , and #8 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Natalie F. Bennett, James C. Shah, and Melissa S. Weiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 10/05/2022. (lh)
October 5, 2022 MN State Bar status verified as active for Melissa S. Weiner not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (mg)
October 4, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Melissa S. Weiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3678753) by Abigail Busler, Sean Chambers, Susanne Hanes, Carl Kirksey, Marueen Love, Taylor Simms, Chantel Young. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Coleman, Gregory)
October 4, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney James C. Shah to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3678429) by Abigail Busler, Sean Chambers, Susanne Hanes, Carl Kirksey, Marueen Love, Taylor Simms, Chantel Young. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Coleman, Gregory)
October 4, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Natalie F. Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3678420) by Abigail Busler, Sean Chambers, Susanne Hanes, Carl Kirksey, Marueen Love, Taylor Simms, Chantel Young. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Coleman, Gregory)
October 3, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/22/2022 at 03:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg)
October 3, 2022 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Nissan North America, Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel (Gregory Coleman) by mail. (mg)
October 3, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
October 3, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
October 3, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Gregory F. Coleman, Adam A. Edwards admitted to this court. (mg)
October 3, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for William A. Ladnier not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (mg)
October 3, 2022 PA State Bar status verified as active for Lawrence Deutsch, Jeffrey L. Osterwise, Russell D. Paul not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (mg)
October 3, 2022 NV State Bar status verified as active for Norberto J. Cisneros, Barbara McDonald not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (mg) Modified on 10/3/2022 (mg).
October 3, 2022 PA State Bar status verified as active for James C. Shah, Natalie Finkelman Bennett not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (mg) Modified on 10/3/2022 (mg).
October 3, 2022 NY State Bar status verified as active for Mitchell M. Breit not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (mg)
October 3, 2022 CA State Bar status verified as active for Tarek H. Zohdy, Cody R. Padgett, Laura Goolsby not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (mg)
October 3, 2022 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Lawrence Deutsch, Jeffrey L. Osterwise, Melissa S. Weiner, James C. Shah, Natalie Finkelman Bennett, Norberto J. Cisneros, Barbara McDonald, William A. Ladnier, Mitchell M. Breit, Tarek H. Zohdy, Cody R. Padgett, Laura Goolsby, Russell D. Paul: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/24/2022. (mg)
September 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nissan North America, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3676918), filed by Sean Chambers, Carl Kirksey, Abigail Busler, Marueen Love, Chantel Young, Taylor Simms, Susanne Hanes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - NHTSA Complaints, #2 Exhibit 2 - TSBs, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Busler et al v. Nissan North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abigail Busler
Represented By: Adam A. Edwards
Represented By: Barbara McDonald
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: James C. Shah
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Osterwise
Represented By: Laura Goolsby
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Melissa S. Weiner
Represented By: Mitchell M. Breit
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Represented By: Norberto J. Cisneros
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: William A. Ladnier
Represented By: Laura E. Goolsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanne Hanes
Represented By: Adam A. Edwards
Represented By: Barbara McDonald
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: James C. Shah
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Osterwise
Represented By: Laura Goolsby
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Melissa S. Weiner
Represented By: Mitchell M. Breit
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Represented By: Norberto J. Cisneros
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: William A. Ladnier
Represented By: Laura E. Goolsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Kirksey
Represented By: Adam A. Edwards
Represented By: Barbara McDonald
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: James C. Shah
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Osterwise
Represented By: Laura Goolsby
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Melissa S. Weiner
Represented By: Mitchell M. Breit
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Represented By: Norberto J. Cisneros
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: William A. Ladnier
Represented By: Laura E. Goolsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marueen Love
Represented By: Adam A. Edwards
Represented By: Barbara McDonald
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: James C. Shah
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Osterwise
Represented By: Laura Goolsby
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Melissa S. Weiner
Represented By: Mitchell M. Breit
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Represented By: Norberto J. Cisneros
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: William A. Ladnier
Represented By: Laura E. Goolsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Simms
Represented By: Adam A. Edwards
Represented By: Barbara McDonald
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: James C. Shah
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Osterwise
Represented By: Laura Goolsby
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Melissa S. Weiner
Represented By: Mitchell M. Breit
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Represented By: Norberto J. Cisneros
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: William A. Ladnier
Represented By: Laura E. Goolsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Chambers
Represented By: Adam A. Edwards
Represented By: Barbara McDonald
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: James C. Shah
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Osterwise
Represented By: Laura Goolsby
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Melissa S. Weiner
Represented By: Mitchell M. Breit
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Represented By: Norberto J. Cisneros
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: William A. Ladnier
Represented By: Laura E. Goolsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chantel Young
Represented By: Adam A. Edwards
Represented By: Barbara McDonald
Represented By: Cody R. Padgett
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: James C. Shah
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Osterwise
Represented By: Laura Goolsby
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Melissa S. Weiner
Represented By: Mitchell M. Breit
Represented By: Natalie Finkelman Bennett
Represented By: Norberto J. Cisneros
Represented By: Russell D. Paul
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: William A. Ladnier
Represented By: Laura E. Goolsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?