Landstar Ranger, Inc. v. Aviator Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Landstar Ranger, Inc.
Defendant: Aviator Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00782
Filed: October 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Given the pendency of a Motion for Entry of Default #15 , it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for December 5, 2022 is CONTINUED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/28/2022. (kc)
November 16, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Aviator Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. by Landstar Ranger, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Appendix A-Declaration of John T. Husk, #2 Attachment Proposed Order-Entry of Default)(Seaton, Henry)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for John T. Husk to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 10/31/2022. (lh)
October 27, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE by Landstar Ranger, Inc. of Withdrawal of Counsel Jeffrey E. Cox (Seaton, Henry)
October 27, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed by Landstar Ranger, Inc.. Aviator Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. served on 10/25/2022. (Seaton, Henry)
October 21, 2022 Filing 11 Summons issued as to Aviator Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. (Service pages returned to counsel by regular mail.) (kc)
October 20, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Aviator Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.. (Seaton, Henry)
October 20, 2022 VA State Bar status verified as active for John T. Husk not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc)
October 19, 2022 Filing 9 Summons issued as to Aviator Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. (Service pages returned to counsel by regular mail.) (kc) Modified on 10/20/2022 (kc).
October 19, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney John T. Husk to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3688362) by Landstar Ranger, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Seaton, Henry)
October 6, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Aviator Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.. (Seaton, Henry)
October 5, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
October 5, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
October 5, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 12/5/2022 at 01:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (kc)
October 5, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Henry E. Seaton, III admitted to this court. (kc)
October 5, 2022 VA State Bar status verified as active for John T. Husk, Jeffrey Ellison Cox not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc)
October 5, 2022 NOTICE TO COUNSEL John T. Husk, Jeffrey Ellison Cox: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/26/2022. (kc)
October 4, 2022 Filing 3 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Landstar Ranger, Inc. (kc)
October 4, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry E. Seaton, III on behalf of Landstar Ranger, Inc. (kc)
October 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aviator Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3678419), filed by Landstar Ranger, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Appendix A Invoice Summary, #2 Attachment Appendix B Invoice BOL, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landstar Ranger, Inc. v. Aviator Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landstar Ranger, Inc.
Represented By: Henry E. Seaton, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Ellison Cox
Represented By: John T. Husk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aviator Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?