Kentucky Bourbon Distillers Ltd. v. Shaan, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kentucky Bourbon Distillers Ltd. doing business as Willett Distillery, The
Defendant: Shaan, Inc., Nikki Patel, Kevin Patel and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2022cv00873
Filed: October 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1501 Trademark/Anti-Cybersquatting Consumer Protect Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: On December 16, 2022, Plaintiff Kentucky Bourbon Distillers, Ltd. filed a motion to continue the initial case management conference set on December 20, 2022. (Doc. No. #22 ). The motion is GRANTED. The initial case management conference is CONTINUED to January 31, 2023, at 10:30 a.m. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/19/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
December 19, 2022 Reset Hearing: The Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 1/31/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ln)
December 16, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Kentucky Bourbon Distillers Ltd.. (Burgener, Joshua)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Andrew D. Dorisio to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda Hill, Clerk of Court, on 11/28/2022. (lh)
November 15, 2022 Filing 20 RECEIPT #34675067652 in the amount of $150.00 posted by Kentucky Bourbon Distillers Ltd. re #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew D. Dorisio. (ln)
November 7, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for attorney Andrew D. Dorisio to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Kentucky Bourbon Distillers Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Burgener, Joshua)
November 2, 2022 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 11/2/2022. The Court held a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. No. 2 ). The Court encouraged the parties to explore a resolution of this case. The parties agreed to file a report no later than January 3, 2023. (Court Reporter Betsy Pierucki.) ORDER TO ENTER. (Hearing lasted :20)(sw)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: On November 1, 2022, the Court held a hearing on Plaintiff Kentucky Bourbon Distillers, Ltd.'s ("Willett") Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. No. #2 ). The Court encourages the parties to explore a resolution of this case. The parties agreed to do so and file a report no later than January 3, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/1/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
October 31, 2022 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion to Set Hrg re App for TRO & Order granting same served on SHAAN and Kevin Patel on 10/29/2022, filed by Kentucky Bourbon Distillers Ltd.. (Burgener, Joshua)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: On October 28, 2022, Plaintiff Kentucky Bourbon Distillers, Ltd. ("Willett") filed a Motion to Set Hearing Regarding Plaintiffs Application for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. #14 . Willett's motion is GRANTED. The Court sets a hearing on Tuesday, November 1, 2022 at 1:00 p.m. Willett, having failed to provide any reason why the Court should consider the application without Defendants having notice, shall give notice, including a copy of this order, to each Defendant and file proof of the same on the docket. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/28/2022. (kc)
October 28, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION TO SET HEARING REGARDING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Kentucky Bourbon Distillers Ltd.. (Burgener, Joshua)
October 28, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed by Kentucky Bourbon Distillers Ltd.. Kevin Patel served on 10/28/2022. (Burgener, Joshua)
October 28, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed by Kentucky Bourbon Distillers Ltd.. Nikki Patel served on 10/28/2022. (Burgener, Joshua)
October 28, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by Kentucky Bourbon Distillers Ltd.. Shaan, Inc. served on 10/28/2022. (Burgener, Joshua)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Willett's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. No. #2 ) is hereby DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Willett may refile its motion in compliance with the Federal and Local Rules. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/28/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
October 28, 2022 Filing 9 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kentucky Bourbon Distillers Ltd.. (Burgener, Joshua)
October 27, 2022 Filing 8 Summons issued as to Kevin Patel, Nikki Patel, and Shaan, Inc. Service copies will be picked up by counsel at the Intake Window between 8:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m. (ln)
October 27, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 12/20/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ln)
October 27, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
October 27, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
October 27, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kentucky Bourbon Distillers Ltd. (ln)
October 27, 2022 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Kentucky Bourbon Distillers Ltd. . (Burgener, Joshua)
October 27, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Kentucky Bourbon Distillers Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5/5/09 Registration Certificate, #2 Exhibit Photo, #3 Exhibit Proposed TRO)(Burgener, Joshua). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 10/31/2022 (ln).
October 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe, Kevin Patel, Nikki Patel, Shaan, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number BTNMDC-3693680) filed by Kentucky Bourbon Distillers Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Photo, #2 Exhibit B - 5/5/09 Registration Certificate, #3 Exhibit C - Two Photos, #4 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)
October 27, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Joshua L. Burgener admitted to this court. (ln)
October 27, 2022 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Andrew Dorisio: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 11/17/2022. (ln)
October 27, 2022 KY State Bar status verified as active for Andrew Dorisio not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ln)
October 27, 2022 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#4 : The form for the Business Entity Disclosure Statement was not used. Counsel shall re-file the document using the form on the Court's website under the Forms section. Counsel shall use the event Business Entity Disclosure Statement under Other Documents when filing this document. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kentucky Bourbon Distillers Ltd. v. Shaan, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kentucky Bourbon Distillers Ltd. doing business as Willett Distillery, The
Represented By: Andrew Dorisio
Represented By: Joshua L. Burgener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikki Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?