King et al v. Hernandez
Plaintiff: Bill W. King, Jr. and Sheet Metal Workers National Health Fund
Defendant: Eric Hernandez
Case Number: 3:2022cv00906
Filed: November 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AMENDING NOVEMBER 30 ORDER: The Order entered November 30, 2022 (Docket Entry No. #9 ) indicated that the rescheduled initial case management conference was set on Tuesday, March 2, 2023, which was a scrivener's error as March 2 is a Thursday. The prior order is AMENDED to reflect that the date of the rescheduled initial case management conference is 10:30 a.m., Thursday, March 2, 2023, using the Court's conference line at 1-877-402-9753 access code 3808663#. All other provisions of the November 30, 2022 order remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 12/5/2022. (ln)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's motion to reschedule the initial case management conference (Docket Entry No. #8 ) because appearance has yet been made on behalf of Defendant, and which, for that reason, is GRANTED. Subject to further order, the initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED from December 6, 2022, to 10:30 a.m., Tuesday, March 2, 2023, by telephone conference. To participate in the conference, the parties will use the Court's conference line at 1-877-402-9753 access code 3808663#. Plaintiff's counsel shall serve a copy of this order on Defendant's counsel or otherwise ensure that Defendant is aware of the rescheduled date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 11/30/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
November 30, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Bill W. King, Jr, Sheet Metal Workers National Health Fund. (Jennings, R.)
November 30, 2022 Reset Hearing: The Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 3/2/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ln)
November 17, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Bill W. King, Jr, Sheet Metal Workers National Health Fund. Eric Hernandez served on 11/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Kelly Kerr regarding military status, age and competency)(Jennings, R.)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/10/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
November 9, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 12/6/2022 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ln)
November 9, 2022 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Eric Hernandez. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ln)
November 9, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
November 9, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
November 9, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for R. Jan Jennings admitted to this court. (ln)
November 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eric Hernandez (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3701860) filed by Bill W. King, Jr, Sheet Metal Workers National Health Fund. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King et al v. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill W. King, Jr.
Represented By: R. Jan Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers National Health Fund
Represented By: R. Jan Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?