Taylor v. Trinity Correctional Food Services et al
Plaintiff: Corey Taylor
Defendant: Trinity Correctional Food Services and Metropolitan Government, The
Case Number: 3:2022cv00920
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Petition for Temporary Restraining Order by Corey Taylor (ad)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PETITION OF JUDICIAL NOTICE "Sur-Reply" by Corey Taylor (mg)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PETITION OF JUDICIAL NOTICE by Corey Taylor. (mg)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Because Taylor has not complied with those requirements and does not title his motion as one for a temporary restraining order, the Court construes it as a motion for preliminary injunctive relief under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65. Such a motion is premature because the defendant has not appeared in the action and was not served with the petition. The motion (Doc. No. #7 ) is therefore TERMINATED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refiling after Taylor has served Trinity Correctional Food Services and it has appeared in the action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/21/22. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PETITION for Injunctive Relief by Corey Taylor. (kc)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern added per Order #6 . (kc)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is GRANTED. Plaintiff, Corey Taylor, is hereby assessed the full $350 filing fee. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to the administrator of inmate trust fund accounts at the Davidson County Sheriff's Office. The complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted under Section 1983 against The Metropolitan Government. All claims against The Metropolitan Government, or Metro, DISMISSED. This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/8/2022. (xc: Warden and Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) Modified on 12/12/2022 (kc).
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/8/2022. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.) (mg)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Corey Taylor. (mg)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint by Corey Taylor. (mg)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Government, The and Trinity Correctional Food Services, filed by Corey Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Lab Results)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Trinity Correctional Food Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Correctional Food Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Government, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?