Jacobs v. County of Rutherford et al
Plaintiff: Taylor Jacobs
Defendant: County of Rutherford and (f/n/u) Henderson
Case Number: 3:2022cv00921
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2023 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Taylor Jacobs. (kc)
January 10, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Order to obtain documents by Taylor Jacobs. (kc) (Main Document 5 replaced on 1/10/2023) (kc).
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff's IFP application #2 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the filing of a new, properly supported application. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail Plaintiff a blank IFP application (short form). Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/21/2022. (xc: IFP short form and Order forwarded to Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
November 15, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
November 15, 2022 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.) (ad)
November 14, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Taylor Jacobs. (ad)
November 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Rutherford, (f/n/u) Henderson, filed by Taylor Jacobs.(ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs v. County of Rutherford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (f/n/u) Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?