WyattZier, LLC v. Wheelers Raid Distillery, LLC
Plaintiff: WyattZier, LLC
Defendant: Wheelers Raid Distillery, LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv01034
Filed: December 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Continue. The Initial Case Management Conference is hereby reset to March 27, 2023 at 9:30 a.m. via telephone. All parties shall call 1-877-336-1831, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate. If a party has difficulty connecting to the call or has been on hold for more than five (5) minutes, please call 615-736-7344. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 02/10/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
February 10, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by WyattZier, LLC. (Mills, Paige)
February 10, 2023 Reset Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 3/27/2023 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ad)
December 22, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by WyattZier, LLC. Wheelers Raid Distillery, LLC served on 12/20/2022. (Mills, Paige)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 12/21/22. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
December 20, 2022 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Wheelers Raid Distillery, LLC. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (ad)
December 20, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 2/14/2023 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ad)
December 20, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
December 20, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad)
December 20, 2022 TN State Bar status verified as active for Paige Waldrop Mills admitted to this court. (ad)
December 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wheelers Raid Distillery, LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3728088), filed by WyattZier, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - June 23, 2020 Letter, #3 Exhibit B - November 17, 2021 Letter, #4 Exhibit C - September 30, 2022 Letter)(ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WyattZier, LLC v. Wheelers Raid Distillery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WyattZier, LLC
Represented By: Paige Waldrop Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheelers Raid Distillery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?