Stanley v. Nissan North America, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Stanley
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc. and Cummins, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00261
Filed: March 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 , #17 , #18 , #19 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Bonnie K. St. Charles, J. Simone Jones, Eric S. Mattson, and Stephanie C. Stern to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 05/03/2023. (lh)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order IL State Bar status verified as active for Stephanie C. Stern, Bonnie K. St. Charles, J. Simone Jones, Eric S. Mattson not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for attorney Stephanie C. Stern to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3809944) by Cummins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Cert. of Good Standing)(Baltz, Kevin)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for attorney Eric S. Mattson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3809932) by Cummins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Cert. of Good Standing)(Baltz, Kevin)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for attorney J. Simone Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3809928) by Cummins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Cert. of Good Standing)(Baltz, Kevin)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for attorney Bonnie K. St. Charles to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3809914) by Cummins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Cert. of Good Standing)(Baltz, Kevin)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Good cause appearing, the Court hereby grants Defendant Cummins Inc.'s Unopposed Motion #13 for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Class Action Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Cummins Inc.'s deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Class Action Complaint #1 is extended to June 2, 2023. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/25/2023. (ln)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cummins, Inc.. (Baltz, Kevin)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Cummins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment (Proposed) Order)(Baltz, Kevin)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order TX State Bar status verified as active for E. Paul Cauley, Jr admitted to this court. (kc)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nathan Stanley. Nissan North America, Inc. waiver sent on 4/3/2023. (Stranch, James)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 , #7 , #8 , #9 , and #10 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Robert Hilliard, Lauren Akers, Bonnie J. Rickert, Steve W. Berman, and Jerrod C. Patterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 04/04/2023. (lh)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Jerrod C. Patterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3795310) by Nathan Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Stranch, James)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Steve W. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3795299) by Nathan Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Stranch, James)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Bonnie J. Rickert to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3795131) by Nathan Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Stranch, James)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Lauren Akers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3791637) by Nathan Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Stranch, James)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Robert Hilliard to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3791561) by Nathan Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Stranch, James)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons issued as to Cummins, Inc. Service packet returned to counsel by regular mail. (kc)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 6/12/2023 at 01:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (kc)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for James Gerard Stranch, IV, James Gerard Stranch, III, Michael G. Stewart admitted to this court. (kc)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order OH State Bar status verified as active for Bonnie J. Rickert not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order State Bar status verified as active for Steve W. Berman (WA), Jerrod C. Patterson (WA), Robert C. Hilliard (TX), Lauren Akers (TX) not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO COUNSEL Steve W. Berman, Jerrod C. Patterson, Robert C. Hilliard, Lauren Akers, Bonnie J. Rickert: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 4/14/2023. (kc)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cummins, Inc., Nissan North America, Inc. (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3788751), filed by Nathan Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanley v. Nissan North America, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Stanley
Represented By: Bonnie J. Rickert
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, III
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Jerrod C. Patterson
Represented By: Lauren Akers
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Michael G. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: E. Paul Cauley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins, Inc.
Represented By: Bonnie K. St. Charles
Represented By: Eric S. Mattson
Represented By: Johnnet Simone Jones
Represented By: Kevin C. Baltz
Represented By: Stephanie C. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?