Bhakta v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Roshan Bhakta
Defendant: FCA US LLC doing business as Jeep
Case Number: 3:2023cv00933
Filed: August 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's motion to continue the initial case management conference (Docket No. #11 ), which is represented to be unopposed and is therefore GRANTED. The initial case management conference, which is currently set for October 26, 2023, is RESCHEDULED for November 27, 2023, at 3:00 p.m. (CT) using the Court's conference line at 1-877-402-9753, access code 3808663#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/06/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
October 6, 2023 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Continue 10/26/2023 Initial Case Management Conference by Roshan Bhakta. (Kimes, Isaac)
October 6, 2023 Reset Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 11/27/2023 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ad)
October 3, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Gordon J. Brady admitted to this court. (ad)
October 2, 2023 Filing 10 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by FCA US LLC. (Brady, Gordon)
October 2, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by FCA US LLC.(Brady, Gordon)
September 13, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Roshan Bhakta. FCA US LLC served on 9/11/2023. (Kimes, Isaac)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/1/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
September 1, 2023 Filing 6 Summons issued as to FCA US LLC. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ad)
September 1, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ad)
September 1, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 10/26/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (ad)
September 1, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
September 1, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad)
September 1, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for James Gerard Stranch, IV, Isaac Kimes admitted to this court. (ad)
August 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3902133), filed by Roshan Bhakta. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - A-safety recall on Model Year 2022 and 2023 Jeep Wagoneers and Jeep Grand Wagoneers, #3 Exhibit - B- Safety Recall Report)(ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bhakta v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roshan Bhakta
Represented By: Isaac Kimes
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC doing business as Jeep
Represented By: Gordon J. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?