Madigan v. Kiewit Infrastructure South Co.
Plaintiff: Ryan Madigan
Defendant: Kiewit Infrastructure South Co.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00957
Filed: September 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and Notice of Mediation re #1 Notice of Removal, Kiewit Infrastructure South Co. answer due 12/15/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 9/20/2023. (af)
September 19, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 and Notice of Mediation by Kiewit Infrastructure South Co. (White, Mary Beth) Modified on 9/20/2023 (af).
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/12/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
September 11, 2023 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kiewit Infrastructure South Co.. (White, Mary Beth)
September 8, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 1/18/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (af)
September 8, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (af)
September 8, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (af)
September 8, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (af)
September 8, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kiewit Infrastructure South Co. from Circuit Court for Davidson County, case number 23C1685. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNMDC-3906561) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Notices to Plaintiff Atty and State Court Clerk, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(af)
September 8, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mary Beth White, Bradford Jones Spicer admitted to this court. (af)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madigan v. Kiewit Infrastructure South Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Madigan
Represented By: Bradford Jones Spicer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiewit Infrastructure South Co.
Represented By: Mary Beth White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?