Philalom v. TJX Companies, Inc., The
Plaintiff: Lynnese Philalom
Defendant: TJX Companies, Inc., The doing business as TJ Maxx
Case Number: 3:2023cv00988
Filed: September 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
2 Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/20/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
September 18, 2023 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by TJX Companies, Inc., The. (Henry, Alaric)
September 18, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 12/18/2023 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc)
September 18, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
September 18, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
September 18, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
September 18, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Craig Powers Glenn, Alaric A. Henry admitted to this court. (kc)
September 15, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lynnese Philalom from Davidson County Circuit Court, case number 23C1785. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNMDC-3912862) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philalom v. TJX Companies, Inc., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynnese Philalom
Represented By: Craig Powers Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TJX Companies, Inc., The doing business as TJ Maxx
Represented By: Alaric A. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?