Bengston v. Chuy's Opco, Inc.
Plaintiff: Susan Bengston
Defendant: Chuy's Opco, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00999
Filed: September 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 4/29/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2025 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6B before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/14/2025; Exhibit List due by 4/14/2025; and Witness List due by 4/14/2025. All lawyers who will participate in the trial must attend the pretrial conference. If a settlement is reached before two business days of trial the cost of summoning the jury may be assessed against the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/9/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/9/2024; Discovery due by 5/7/2024; Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 11/8/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
November 8, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Norris A. Kessler, III admitted to this court. (mg)
November 7, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 11/7/2023.(Hearing lasted 0:29)(mcc)
November 6, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Norris A. Kessler, III on behalf of Susan Bengston (Kessler, Norris)
November 2, 2023 Filing 9 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Chuy's Opco, Inc.. (Telfeyan, Bradford)
October 6, 2023 Filing 8 ***DISREGARD. FILED INCORRECTLY***COMPLAINT . Vanessa Hill vs AHS Management Company, Inc., d/b/a Ardent Health Services; DIVISIONAL OFFICE: Nashville; (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATNMDC-3927520). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons) Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.(De Arcangelis, Kimberly) Modified on 10/6/2023 (af).
September 26, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Chuy's Opco, Inc..(Telfeyan, Bradford)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/21/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
September 20, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 11/7/2023 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (kc)
September 20, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
September 20, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
September 20, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
September 20, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chuy's Opco, Inc. from Rutherford County Circuit Court, case number 81340. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNMDC-3916915) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Notices, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)
September 20, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Andrew P. Davis, Bradford Telfeyan, Emily Slass admitted to this court. (kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bengston v. Chuy's Opco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Bengston
Represented By: Andrew P. Davis
Represented By: Norris A. Kessler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuy's Opco, Inc.
Represented By: Bradford Telfeyan
Represented By: Emily Slass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?