Paige v. Holloway
Petitioner: James Andrew Paige
Respondent: James M. Holloway
Case Number: 3:2023cv01102
Filed: October 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2023 Filing 10 RECEIPT #300001539 in the amount of $5.00 posted by James Andrew Paige re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (kc)
November 21, 2023 Filing 9 Letter from James Andrew Paige. (kc)
November 9, 2023 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by James Andrew Paige. (af)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. To proceed in this case, the petitioner MUST pay the $5 filing fee within 30 DAYS of the date this order is entered on the docket. The petitioner's submission must include the assigned case number, No. 3:23-cv-01102. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/8/2023. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)
November 2, 2023 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT filed by James Andrew Paige re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (kc)
October 23, 2023 TN State Bar status verified as active for Andrew H. Smith admitted to this court. (kc)
October 20, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew H. Smith on behalf of James M. Holloway (Smith, Andrew)
October 19, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
October 19, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ad)
October 19, 2023 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by James Andrew Paige. (ad)
October 19, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by James Andrew Paige. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Criminal Court Documents)(ad)
October 19, 2023 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.) (ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paige v. Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Andrew Paige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James M. Holloway
Represented By: Andrew H. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?