Nokes v. Commissioner of Social Security et al
Plaintiff: Tammy Kim Nokes
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 3:2024cv00531
Filed: April 30, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2024 Filing 10 SSA Administrative Record filed per #1 Complaint.. (Sorkin, Adam)
June 4, 2024 IL State Bar status verified as active for Adam R. Sorkin admitted to this court. (hb)
May 28, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam R. Sorkin on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Sorkin, Adam)
May 3, 2024 Filing 8 ***DISREGARD. DUPLICATE ENTRY.*** NOTICE of Consent of the Plaintiff Tammy Kim Nokes to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. (kc) Modified on 5/6/2024 (kc).
May 1, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Consent of the Plaintiff filed by Tammy Kim Nokes to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: This Order reflects the adoption of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 5/1/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 5/1/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
May 1, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES ARISING UNDER 42 U.S.C. 405(g) (ad)
May 1, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ad)
May 1, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for April Adams Carr admitted to this court. (ad)
April 30, 2024 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Tammy Kim Nokes. (ad)
April 30, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Tammy Kim Nokes. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeal Council Action)(ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nokes v. Commissioner of Social Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Kim Nokes
Represented By: April Adams Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Adam R. Sorkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?