Burns v. Dollar General Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Cecil Burns
Defendant: Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, DG Retail, LLC, DG Louisiana, LLC and DG Promotions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00728
Filed: June 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2024 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cecil Burns. All Defendants. (Herrington, Brian)
July 16, 2024 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cecil Burns.(Herrington, Brian)
July 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for James B. Justice to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 07/03/2024. (lh)
June 20, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney James B. Justice to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4104201) by Cecil Burns. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Snyder, Brent)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Brian K. Herrington to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 06/20/2024. (lh)
June 20, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Brian K. Herrington to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Cecil Burns (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4104035) by Cecil Burns. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Certificate of Good Standing)(Snyder, Brent)
June 13, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2024 at 02:00 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (am)
June 13, 2024 Filing 5 Summons issued as to DG Promotions, Inc., DG Retail, LLC, Dollar General Corporation. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (am)
June 13, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (am)
June 13, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am)
June 13, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am)
June 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DG Promotions, Inc., DG Retail, LLC, Dollar General Corporation (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4099947), filed by Cecil Burns. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(am)
June 13, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for Brent S. Snyder admitted to this court. (am)
June 13, 2024 MS State Bar status verified as active for Brian Herrington, James B. Justice not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (am)
June 13, 2024 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Brian Herrington, James B. Justice: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 7/5/2024. (am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. Dollar General Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar General Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DG Retail, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DG Louisiana, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DG Promotions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil Burns
Represented By: Brian K. Herrington
Represented By: James B. Justice
Represented By: Brent S. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?