Jan Wingo et al v. HCA Healthcare Marketing and Corporate Affairs, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Devon Wingo and Jan Wingo
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive and HCA Healthcare Marketing and Corporate Affairs LLC a Florida limited liability company doing business as HCA Healthcare
Case Number: 3:2024cv00817
Filed: July 5, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Jack Zouhary
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE: Defendant HCA Healthcare, Inc. ("HCA") has notified this Court that the case captioned Wingo, et al. v. HCA Healthcare Marketing and Corporate Affairs LLC, et al., No. 3:24-cv-817 (M.D. Tenn. filed July 5, 2024) is related and should be consolidated with this action (Case No. 3:23-cv-684). Pursuant to this Court's previous Order (Doc. 19), the above related case is consolidated with this action (Case No. 3:23-cv-684). All papers previously filed and served to date in the Wingo case are deemed part of the record in this consolidated action. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order and the previous Order (Doc. 19) in the above-related case and administratively close that case. Signed by District Judge Jack Zouhary on 7/16/2024. (Note: Order 19 from lead case has been entered. See docket entry no. #18 .) (mg)
July 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: It has come to the Court's attention that this case is related and should be consolidated into In re: HCA Healthcare, Inc. Data Security Litigation, Case No. 3:23-cv-00684 (the "Consolidated Action"), which is assigned to U.S. District Judge Jack Zouhary. As such, the Clerk is directed to reassign the case to Judge Zouhary. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/16/2024. (mg)
July 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: This matter, having come before the Court by the Plaintiffs in the above-captioned cases by their Motion to Consolidate Actions and Set Schedule for Appointment of Interim Co-lead Counsel and Filing of Consolidated Class Action Complaint (the "Motion") (Doc. No. #10 ), and the Court having reviewed the papers and for good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED as set forth below. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to administratively close all of the Related Actions except Silvers. Any initial case management conferences scheduled in the Related Actions are CANCELLED to be reset by the Magistrate Judge following entry of this Order. All future filings in the Consolidated Action shall be filed under the lead case number 3:23-cv-00684. Plaintiffs in the Consolidated Actions shall file an operative Consolidated Class Action Complaint within 45 days of the Order Appointing Leadership. Defendant's response to the Consolidated Class Action Complaint shall be due 45 days after the Consolidated Class Action Complaint is filed. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/23/2023. (Note: This Order was previously entered on 8/23/2024 in Case No. 3:23-cv-684. Per District Judge Jack Zouhary's Order, the Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order (Doc. 19) in 3:24-cv-817 and administratively close that case.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
July 8, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 9/5/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (ad)
July 8, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
July 8, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad)
July 8, 2024 Filing 14 ***DISREGARD***NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge., NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad) Modified on 7/8/2024 (ad).
July 8, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ad)
July 8, 2024 Filing 12 Case transferred in from the District of California Central; Case Number 5:24-cv-01317. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 8, 2024 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Melanie M. Blunschi, Mark D Potter, James Michael Treglio: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 7/29/2024. (ad)
July 8, 2024 CA State Bar status verified as active for Melanie M. Blunschi, Mark D Potter, James Michael Treglio not admitted to this court - Local counsel required. (ad)
July 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF TENNESSEE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) AND STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT AND [ECF Nos. #8 , #9 ] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. The Court, having considered the Stipulation and finding good cause therefor, hereby GRANTS the Stipulation and ORDERS as follows: This action is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee; and Defendant's deadline to respond to the complaint is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (yl) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2024.]
July 1, 2024 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to HCA Healthcare Marketing and Corporate Affairs, LLC answer now due 7/31/2024, filed by Defendant HCA Healthcare Marketing and Corporate Affairs, LLC.(Blunschi, Melanie) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2024.]
June 30, 2024 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Order Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Defendant HCA Healthcare Marketing and Corporate Affairs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blunschi, Melanie) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2024.]
June 30, 2024 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee filed by Defendant HCA Healthcare Marketing and Corporate Affairs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blunschi, Melanie) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2024.]
June 26, 2024 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2024.]
June 26, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2024.]
June 26, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen for discovery. Pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:24-cv-1317 MEMF (SSCx). (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2024.]
June 24, 2024 CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Devon Wingo, Jan Wingo, upon Defendant HCA Healthcare Marketing and Corporate Affairs, LLC served on 5/28/2024. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity [FILED IN STATE COURT 5/31/2024 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 29 EXHIBIT 29 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2024.]
June 24, 2024 COPY OF EFILED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, HCA Healthcare Marketing and Corporate Affairs, LLC amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiffs Devon Wingo, Jan Wingo [FILED IN STATE COURT 5/16/2024 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 26 EXHIBIT 26 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2024.]
June 24, 2024 CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, HCA Healthcare Marketing and Corporate Affairs, LLC. Jury Demanded. filed by Plaintiffs Devon Wingo, Jan Wingo. [FILED IN STATE COURT 8/14/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 5 EXHIBIT 5 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2024.]
June 24, 2024 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant HCA Healthcare Marketing and Corporate Affairs, LLC, served on 6/24/2024. (Blunschi, Melanie) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2024.]
June 24, 2024 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant HCA Healthcare Marketing and Corporate Affairs, LLC identifying HCA Healthcare Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Blunschi, Melanie) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2024.]
June 24, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant HCA Healthcare Marketing and Corporate Affairs, LLC. (Blunschi, Melanie) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2024.]
June 24, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number CVRI2304180 Receipt No: ACACDC-37710759 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant HCA Healthcare Marketing and Corporate Affairs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Class Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Class Action Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Certificate of Counel, #4 Exhibit 4 - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit 5 - Class Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6 - Summons, #7 Exhibit 7 - Notice of CMC, #8 Exhibit 8 - Notice of CMC, #9 Exhibit 9 - Notice of Dept. Assignment, #10 Exhibit 10 - Certificate of Mailing, #11 Exhibit 11 - Case Management Order, #12 Exhibit 12 - Minute Order, #13 Exhibit 13 - Minute Order, #14 Exhibit 14 - Certificate of Mailing, #15 Exhibit 15 - Minute Order, #16 Exhibit 16 - Notice of OSC, #17 Exhibit 17 - Notice of OSC, #18 Exhibit 18 - Proof of Service, #19 Exhibit 19 - Declaration, #20 Exhibit 20 - Amended Minute Order, #21 Exhibit 21 - Minute Order re CMC - Complex, #22 Exhibit 22 - Certificate of Mailing, #23 Exhibit 23 - Minute Order, #24 Exhibit 24 - Notice of OSC, #25 Exhibit 25 - Minute Order re CMC - Complex, #26 Exhibit 26 - First Amended Class Action Complaint, #27 Exhibit 27 - Amended Summons, #28 Exhibit 28 - Notice of Document Return, #29 Exhibit 29 - Proof of Service of Summons) (Attorney Melanie M. Blunschi added to party HCA Healthcare Marketing and Corporate Affairs, LLC(pty:dft))(Blunschi, Melanie) [Transferred from California Central on 7/8/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jan Wingo et al v. HCA Healthcare Marketing and Corporate Affairs, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA Healthcare Marketing and Corporate Affairs LLC a Florida limited liability company doing business as HCA Healthcare
Represented By: Melanie M. Blunschi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Wingo
Represented By: James Michael Treglio
Represented By: Mark D Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Wingo
Represented By: James Michael Treglio
Represented By: Mark D Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?