Mathavong v. Yates Services LLC
Plaintiff: Suriya Bryson Mathavong
Defendant: Yates Services LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv01254
Filed: October 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Family Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Suriya Bryson Mathavong (Irwin, Lauren) Modified on 12/2/2024 (ad).
November 25, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jin Yoshikawa admitted to this court. (ad)
November 22, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jin Yoshikawa on behalf of Yates Services LLC (Yoshikawa, Jin)
November 22, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for Rocklan W. King, III admitted to this court. (ad)
November 21, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rocklan W. King, III on behalf of Yates Services LLC (King, Rocklan)
October 21, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2025 at 03:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg)
October 21, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
October 21, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
October 21, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg)
October 21, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for Brandon G. Hall, Lauren J. Irwin admitted to this court. (mg)
October 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Yates Services LLC (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4185758), filed by Suriya Bryson Mathavong. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Right to Sue)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathavong v. Yates Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suriya Bryson Mathavong
Represented By: Brandon G. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yates Services LLC
Represented By: Rocklan W. King, III
Represented By: Jin Yoshikawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?