Pavia v. National Collegiate Athletic Association
Plaintiff: Diego Pavia
Defendant: National Collegiate Athletic Association
Case Number: 3:2024cv01336
Filed: November 8, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: William L Campbell
Referring Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: This matter is set for an initial case management conference on January 15, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. (Doc. No. #5 .) The Court's conference line has been changed. Counsel for each party shall call (650) 479-3207 and enter access code 2317 604 8628# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/6/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ab)
December 26, 2024 Filing 44 USCA Case Number 24-6153 for #43 Notice of Appeal filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. Case Manager, Ryan E. Orme. (hb) Modified text on 1/2/2025 (hb).
December 23, 2024 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #41 Memorandum Opinion of the Court, #42 Order on Motion for TRO, by National Collegiate Athletic Association. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ATNMDC-4226759. (Kilaru, Rakesh)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: Plaintiff Diego Pavia's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. No. #8 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/18/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ab)
December 18, 2024 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/18/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ab)
December 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: On December 9, 2024, Defendant filed a Notice that addressed the topic requested and also provided information on other matters. The Court will not consider statements or exhibits concerning matters on topics other than that specifically requested. No additional briefing shall be filed without leave of Court. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 12/10/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ab)
December 9, 2024 Filing 39 NOTICE of Filing by National Collegiate Athletic Association re Motion Hearing, DEFENDANTS FILING RELATING TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of TJA, #2 Exhibit NCAA DI Council Votes, #3 Exhibit ECF 544, #4 Exhibit ECF 535-1, #5 Exhibit NCAA Revenue Sharing House)(Askew, Taylor)
December 7, 2024 Filing 38 Transcript filed for date of December 4, 2024, before Judge William L. Campbell Jr.. Court Reporter: Roxann Harkins, 615-403-8314, roxann_harkins@tnmd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. IT IS THE RESPONSIBILITY OF COUNSEL TO REVIEW THE TRANSCRIPT AND REQUEST REDACTION OF CONTENT CLASSIFIED AS PRIVATE UNDER THE NOTICE TO MEMBERS OF THE BAR, ELECTRONIC AVAILABILITY OF TRANSCRIPTS OF COURT PROCEEDINGS, EFFECTIVE MAY 5, 2008, AVAILABLE ON THE COURT'S WEBSITE UNDER THE CM-ECF CASE INFO LINK, GENERAL INFORMATION, ELECTRONIC TRANSCRIPTS NOTICE. Intent to Request Transcript Redaction due 12/16/2024. Redaction Request due 12/30/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/7/2025. (RH)
December 5, 2024 Filing 37 WITNESS/EXHIBIT LIST prepared by Deputy Clerk, re: Preliminary Injunction Hearing.(ab)
December 4, 2024 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 12/4/2024 re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Diego Pavia. Order to enter. (Court Reporter Roxann Harkins.) (Hearing lasted 2:30)(am)
December 3, 2024 Filing 36 JOINT STIPULATION as to Use of Declarations and Materials at the Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Diego Pavia. (Hernandez, Salvador) Modified text on 12/5/2024 (ab).
December 2, 2024 Filing 35 NOTICE by Diego Pavia re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction regarding Evidence on which Pavia intends to rely upon at the Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Hernandez, Salvador)
December 2, 2024 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Salvador M. Hernandez filed by Diego Pavia re: #33 Reply to Response to Motion,, #22 Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - "Journey into JUCO: What to Know About Playing at the College Level, #2 Exhibit B - NJCAA 2022-23 Annual Report, #3 Exhibit C - College football games today, #4 Exhibit D - Chris Weinke Wikipedia, #5 Exhibit E - The Athletic: Has the transfer portal killed junior college recruiting?, #6 Exhibit F ; NY Times re 40-plus 6th year senior QBs, #7 Exhibit G - Dillon Gabriel Wikipedia, #8 Exhibit H - Box Nix Wikipedia, #9 Exhibit I - Drew Aldridge, "40/60/80 Rule: Do Baseball Community College Transfers Have a Faire Shot?", #10 Exhibit J - NCAA Division 1 Transfer Windows chart)(Hernandez, Salvador)
December 2, 2024 Filing 33 REPLY to Response to re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Diego Pavia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Joel G. Maxcy Declaration, #2 Attachment Maxcy CV, #3 Attachment Maxcy Appendix, #4 Exhibit 2 - Smith Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 - NCAA votes to open up college eligibility to CHL, #6 Exhibit 4 - Second Pavia Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 - Beverly Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6- Joint Status Report from Masterson v. NCAA case, #9 Exhibit 7 - ESPN CHL lawsuit article)(Hernandez, Salvador)
December 2, 2024 Filing 32 NOTICE by National Collegiate Athletic Association re #30 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Notice of Evidence in Support (Askew, Taylor)
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #26 , #27 , #28 , and #29 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Rakesh Kilaru, Tamarra Matthews Johnson, Calanthe Arat, and Max Warren to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 11/25/2024. (lh)
November 22, 2024 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Vaughn Decl., #2 Exhibit Backus Decl., #3 Exhibit Askew Decl., #4 Exhibit NJCAA Mission Statement, #5 Exhibit History of NJCAA, #6 Exhibit Curtright Article, #7 Exhibit Hernandez Article, #8 Exhibit NJCAA NIL Update, #9 Exhibit ESPN Staff Article, #10 Exhibit 247 Sports Pavia Timeline of Events, #11 Exhibit Murray Article, #12 Exhibit Graham Article, #13 Exhibit NCAA D1 Transfer Windows, #14 Exhibit Committee on Reinstatement Approval List)(Askew, Taylor)
November 21, 2024 CA State Bar status verified as active for Tamarra Matthews Johnson (Local Counsel secured) (ab)
November 21, 2024 DC State Bar status verified as active for Rakesh Kilaru, Max Warren. (Local Counsel secured) (ab)
November 20, 2024 Filing 29 MOTION for attorney Max Warren to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4206116) by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Askew, Taylor)
November 20, 2024 Filing 28 MOTION for attorney Calanthe Arat to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4206068) by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Askew, Taylor)
November 20, 2024 Filing 27 MOTION for attorney Tamarra Matthews Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4206040) by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Askew, Taylor)
November 20, 2024 Filing 26 MOTION for attorney Rakesh Kilaru to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4206007) by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Askew, Taylor)
November 18, 2024 Filing 25 ***DISREGARD. ENTERED IN WRONG CASE.*** NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) Modified on 11/18/2024 (kc).
November 18, 2024 Filing 24 ***DISREGARD. ENTERED IN WRONG CASE.*** NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc) Modified on 11/18/2024 (kc).
November 18, 2024 Filing 23 ***DISREGARD. ENTERED IN WRONG CASE.*** NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc) Modified on 11/18/2024 (kc).
November 15, 2024 Filing 21 ***DISREGARD FILED IN WRONG CASE ***COMPLAINT Original, Verified. Ameritech Services, Inc. vs Reliable Fuel Services, LLC; DIVISIONAL OFFICE: Nashville; (Filing fee $405; receipt number ATNMDC-4203479). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Articles of Organization for Reliable Fuel Service, LLC, # 2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Attachment Summons Carl Dail Weaver, # 4 Attachment Summons Reliable Fuel Service, LLC) Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office.(Baggott, Roland) Modified on 11/18/2024 (ab).
November 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: The Court will hold a hearing on Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction on December 4, 2024, at 1:30 p.m., Courtroom 6B. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/14/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ab)
November 14, 2024 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 11/14/2024. Order to enter. (Court Reporter Patty Jennings.) (Hearing lasted :16)(am)
November 14, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for David Joseph Zeitlin, Taylor J. Askew admitted to this court. (ab)
November 13, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor J. Askew on behalf of National Collegiate Athletic Association (Askew, Taylor)
November 13, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by David Joseph Zeitlin on behalf of National Collegiate Athletic Association (Zeitlin, David)
November 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone status conference on November 14, 2024, at 2:00 p.m., to discuss the briefing schedule and hearing. The parties shall call 855-244-8681 and enter access code 2310 964 0001 to be connected to the call. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/13/2024. (ab)
November 12, 2024 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Diego Pavia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State of Ohio v. NCAA)(ab)
November 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/12/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ab)
November 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #8 Motion for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/12/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ab)
November 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/12/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ch)
November 12, 2024 Filing 13 Summons issued as to National Collegiate Athletic Association. (ab)
November 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for Ryan Downton to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 11/8/2024. (lh)
November 8, 2024 Filing 11 Proposed Pretrial Order Granting Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Diego Pavia. (Hernandez, Salvador)
November 8, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to to Exceed Page Limits for Memorandum in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Diego Pavia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Attachment Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - State of Ohio case, #3 Attachment Proposed Order Granting Motion to Exceed Page Limits)(Hernandez, Salvador)
November 8, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing by Diego Pavia re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Attachment Diego Pavia Declaration, #2 Attachment Clark Lea Declaration, #3 Attachment Paul Grindstaff Declaration)(Hernandez, Salvador)
November 8, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Diego Pavia. (Hernandez, Salvador)
November 8, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to National Collegiate Athletic Association. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (Hernandez, Salvador)
November 8, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Ryan Downton to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4199197) by Diego Pavia. (Hernandez, Salvador)
November 8, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 1/15/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (kc)
November 8, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
November 8, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
November 8, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
November 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Collegiate Athletic Association (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4199021), filed by Diego Pavia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 2024-25 NIL Report, #2 Exhibit 2 2024-25 NCAA Manual, #3 Exhibit 3 2024-25 NCAA Guide for Two Year Transfers, #4 Exhibit 4 NCAA Self-Applied Covid Waiver Policy, #5 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/8/2024) (kc).
November 8, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for Salvador M. Hernandez admitted to this court. (kc)
November 8, 2024 TX State Bar status verified as active for Ryan Downton not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pavia v. National Collegiate Athletic Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diego Pavia
Represented By: Salvador M. Hernandez
Represented By: Ryan Downton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Collegiate Athletic Association
Represented By: Taylor J. Askew
Represented By: Tamarra Matthews Johnson
Represented By: Rakesh Kilaru
Represented By: Max Warren
Represented By: David Joseph Zeitlin
Represented By: Calanthe Arat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?