Noland v. Tennessee Pediatrics, P.C.
Plaintiff: Amanda Noland
Defendant: Tennessee Pediatrics, P.C.
Case Number: 3:2024cv01358
Filed: November 15, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Family Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2025 TN State Bar status verified as active for Martha L. Boyd admitted to this court. (sb)
January 8, 2025 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha L. Boyd on behalf of Tennessee Pediatrics, P.C. (Boyd, Martha)
January 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Tennessee Pediatrics, P.C. answer due 1/15/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 1/7/2025. (ch)
January 6, 2025 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Tennessee Pediatrics, P.C.. (Cook, Jennifer)
December 4, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Amanda Noland. Tennessee Pediatrics, P.C. served on 11/22/2024. (Hunter, Anne)
November 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/18/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ch)
November 15, 2024 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Tennessee Pediatrics, P.C. (ad)
November 15, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 1/22/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ad)
November 15, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
November 15, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ad)
November 15, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ad)
November 15, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tennessee Pediatrics, P.C. (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4203328), filed by Amanda Noland. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(ad)
November 15, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for Anne Bennett Hunter, Kaitlyn Elizabeth Lyons admitted to this court. (ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noland v. Tennessee Pediatrics, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Pediatrics, P.C.
Represented By: Martha L. Boyd
Represented By: Jennifer G. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Noland
Represented By: Kaitlyn Elizabeth Lyons
Represented By: Anne Bennett Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?