Gill v. Bonded Filter Co., LLC
Plaintiff: Timothy David Gill
Defendant: Bonded Filter Co., LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv01368
Filed: November 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jeffery S Frensley
Referring Judge: Eli J Richardson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motion for James L. Simon to Appear Pro Hac Vice is granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 12/11/2024. (lh)
December 11, 2024 OH State Bar status verified as active for James L. Simon not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (sb)
December 10, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney James L. Simon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4218158) by Timothy David Gill. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Hunter, Anne)
December 4, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Timothy David Gill. Bonded Filter Co., LLC served on 11/22/2024. (Hunter, Anne)
November 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 11/20/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(sb)
November 19, 2024 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Bonded Filter Co., LLC. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (sb)
November 19, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 2/13/2025 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (sb)
November 19, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (sb)
November 19, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (sb)
November 19, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (sb)
November 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bonded Filter Co., LLC (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4205180), filed by Timothy David Gill. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(sb)
November 19, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for Anne Bennett Hunter, Kaitlyn Elizabeth Lyons admitted to this court. (sb)
November 19, 2024 OH State Bar status verified as active for James L. Simon not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (sb)
November 19, 2024 NOTICE TO COUNSEL James L. Simon: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 12/10/2024. (sb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gill v. Bonded Filter Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy David Gill
Represented By: Kaitlyn Elizabeth Lyons
Represented By: James L. Simon
Represented By: Anne Bennett Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonded Filter Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?