Santiago v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Ramon Santiago
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 3:2024cv01460
Filed: December 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2025 Filing 9 SSA Administrative Record filed per.. (Julis, Rachel)
January 17, 2025 IL State Bar status verified as active for Rachel Julis admitted to this court. Local counsel waived. (kc)
January 16, 2025 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Julis on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Julis, Rachel)
December 19, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Consent of the Plaintiff to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Commissioner is ORDERED to file a copy of the certified administrative record and an answer no later than 60 days after issuance of the Notice of Electronic Filing. Soc. Sec. R. 4(a). The certified administrative record may serve as the answer. Soc. Sec. R. 4(b). If the Commissioner files a motion under Rule 12, that motion must be filed no later than 60 days after issuance of the Notice of Electronic Filing. Soc. Sec. R. 4(c). The plaintiff is ORDERED to file a motion for judgment on the administrative record and an accompanying memorandum in support of the motion no later than thirty days after the certified administrative record and/or answer are filed. Soc. Sec. R. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/16/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 12/16/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)
December 13, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES ARISING UNDER 42 U.S.C. 405(g). (kc)
December 13, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
December 13, 2024 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Ramon Santiago. (kc)
December 13, 2024 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Ramon Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeal Council Action, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santiago v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Santiago
Represented By: April Adams Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Rachel Julis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?