Torres v. O'Malley
Plaintiff: Camille Colon Torres
Defendant: Martin O'Malley
Interested Party: SSA-Email Notification
Case Number: 3:2024cv01509
Filed: December 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff Camille Colon Torres filed this action pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 405(g). In accordance with Rule 4 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions Under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) ("Supplemental Rules"), the Commissioner of Social Security Administration ("Commissioner") has responded by filing an answer, which may be limited to a certified copy of the administrative record. Therefore, the filing of a motion for judgment based on the administrative record is appropriate and necessary for the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. [T]he Plaintiff is directed to file a brief for the requested relief within thirty (30) days of the date on which the Commissioner filed the answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 2/27/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
February 26, 2025 Filing 5 SSA Administrative Record filed per.. (Julis, Rachel)
February 11, 2025 IL State Bar status verified as active for Rachel Julis admitted to this court. (mg)
February 10, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Julis on behalf of Martin O'Malley (Julis, Rachel)
December 30, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES ARISING UNDER 42 U.S.C. 405(g) (mg)
December 30, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg)
December 30, 2024 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Martin O'Malley (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4228609), filed by Camille Colon Torres. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)
December 30, 2024 TN State Bar status verified as active for William N. Benjamin, Jr admitted to this court. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Email Notification
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camille Colon Torres
Represented By: William N. Benjamin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin O'Malley
Represented By: Rachel Julis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?