Sorroeix, Inc.
Debtor: Sorroeix, Inc.
Us Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Trustee: Michael P. Coury
Case Number: 1:2020bk11492
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jimmy L Croom
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2021 Filing 54 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#51 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 01/23/2021. (Admin.)
January 22, 2021 Filing 53 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#48 Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules) Notice Date 01/22/2021. (Admin.)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order Granting Application to Employ Tina Andrade As Real Estate Professional (Related Doc #32) (mjb)
January 21, 2021 Filing 51 Notice Of Hearing; (related document(s)#49 Amended Application to Employ Harris Shelton Hanover Walsh, PLLC as Counsel for Debtor Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Sorroeix, Inc. ) Hearing scheduled 1/27/2021 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
January 20, 2021 Filing 50 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Toni Campbell Parker on behalf of Owen Mize. (Parker, Toni)
January 20, 2021 Filing 49 Amended Application to Employ Harris Shelton Hanover Walsh, PLLC as Counsel for Debtor Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Sorroeix, Inc. (Douglass, Steven)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Documents Due December 28, 2020 (Related Doc #12) (mjb)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER PAST DUE: Order was to have been previously submitted by Steven Douglass (related document(s)#12 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules/Statements or Provide Required Information Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Sorroeix, Inc. ) (lnp)
January 15, 2021 Filing 47 Notice To Take Deposition Of Bridge SFR Loans, LLC Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Sorroeix, Inc.. (Douglass, Steven)
January 14, 2021 Filing 46 Notice of Required Filing Fee and/or Deficient Filing. Issued to Steven N Douglass, Re: Order Granting Application to Employ Real Estate Professional, Due to: Matter has been continued to 1/27/21. (lnp)
January 14, 2021 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#26 Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 5828 Grassy Valley and 3746 Fern Ridge Filed by R. Lee Webber on behalf of Trident Realty Investments, LLC (Webber, R.)) Hearing scheduled 01/27/2021 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
January 14, 2021 Minutes; Disposition: STATUS HEARING CONDUCTED. (related document(s) #13 Order and Notice of Deadlines and Date Set for U.S.C. Section 1188(a) Status Conference. Pre Status Conference Report Due By 12/31/2020.) (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
January 14, 2021 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#27 Application to Employ Harris Shelton Hanover Walsh, PLLC as Counsel for Debtor Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Sorroeix, Inc. ) Hearing scheduled 01/27/2021 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
January 14, 2021 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#44 Response to (related document(s): #26 Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 5828 Grassy Valley and 3746 Fern Ridge ) Filed by Trustee Michael P. Coury) Hearing scheduled 01/27/2021 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
January 14, 2021 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#45 Objection to (related document(s): #26 Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 5828 Grassy Valley and 3746 Fern Ridge ) Filed by Debtor Sorroeix, Inc.) Hearing scheduled 01/27/2021 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
January 7, 2021 Corrected Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#41 Objection to (related document(s): #8 Motion for Adequate Protection, Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 59 Parcels of Real Property ) Filed by Creditor PROPERTY FACTOR AUS, LLC) IN-PERSON Hearing scheduled 1/27/2021 at 09:30 AM . (dap)
January 7, 2021 Corrected Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#37 Response to (related document(s): #8 Motion for Adequate Protection , Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 59 Parcels of Real Property ) Filed by Trustee Michael P. Coury) IN-PERSON Hearing scheduled 1/27/2021 at 09:30 AM . (dap)
January 7, 2021 Corrected Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#8 Motion for Adequate Protection , in addition to Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 59 Parcels of Real Property Filed by Preston Wilson on behalf of Bridge SFR Loans, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)) IN-PERSON Hearing scheduled 1/27/2021 at 09:30 AM. (dap)
January 7, 2021 Corrected Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#18 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Sorroeix, Inc. ) IN-PERSON Hearing scheduled 1/27/2021 at 09:30 AM . (dap)
January 7, 2021 Corrected Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#33 Objection to (related document(s): #8 Motion for Adequate Protection, Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 59 Parcels of Real Property) Filed by Debtor Sorroeix, Inc.) IN-PERSON Hearing scheduled 1/27/2021 at 09:30 AM . (dap)
January 7, 2021 Corrected Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#29 Objection to (related document(s): #18 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f)) filed by Preston Wilson on behalf of Bridge SFR Loans (Wilson, Preston) IN-PERSON Hearing scheduled 1/27/2021 at 09:30 AM . (dap)
January 7, 2021 Corrected Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#40 Objection to (related document(s): #18 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) ) Filed by U.S. Trustee (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)) IN-PERSON Hearing scheduled 1/27/2021 at 09:30 AM . (dap)
January 7, 2021 Corrected Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#39 Objection to (related document(s): #18 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) ) Filed by Creditor PROPERTY FACTOR AUS, LLC) IN-PERSON Hearing scheduled 1/27/2021 at 09:30 AM . (dap)
January 7, 2021 Corrected Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#38 Response to (related document(s): #18 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f)) Filed by Trustee Michael P. Coury) IN-PERSON Hearing scheduled 1/27/2021 at 09:30 AM . (dap)
January 6, 2021 Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#44 Response to (related document(s): #26 Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 5828 Grassy Valley and 3746 Fern Ridge ) Filed by Trustee Michael P. Coury) Hearing scheduled 1/14/2021 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
January 6, 2021 Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#45 Objection to (related document(s): #26 Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 5828 Grassy Valley and 3746 Fern Ridge ) Filed by Debtor Sorroeix, Inc.) Hearing scheduled 1/14/2021 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
January 5, 2021 Filing 45 Objection to (related document(s): #26 Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 5828 Grassy Valley and 3746 Fern Ridge Filing Fee Due $188 filed by Creditor Trident Realty Investments, LLC) Filed by Debtor Sorroeix, Inc. (Douglass, Steven)
January 5, 2021 Filing 44 Response to (related document(s): #26 Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 5828 Grassy Valley and 3746 Fern Ridge Filing Fee Due $188 filed by Creditor Trident Realty Investments, LLC) Filed by Trustee Michael P. Coury (Coury, Michael)
January 4, 2021 Filing 43 The United States Trustee reports that the Meeting of Creditors required under 11 U.S.C. Section 341 has been held and conducted as scheduled. (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
December 31, 2020 Filing 42 Status Report Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Debtor Sorroeix, Inc.. (Douglass, Steven)
December 31, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#29 Objection by Bridge SFR Loans, LLC to (related document(s): #18 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f)) (Wilson, Preston) IN-PERSON Hearing scheduled 01/27/2021 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
December 31, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#18 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Sorroeix, Inc. ) IN-PERSON Hearing scheduled 01/27/2021 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
December 31, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#8 Motion for Adequate Protection , in addition to Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 59 Parcels of Real Property Filed by Preston Wilson on behalf of Bridge SFR Loans, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)) IN-PERSON Hearing scheduled 01/27/2021 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
December 31, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#33 Objection to (related document(s): #8 Motion for Adequate Protection, Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 59 Parcels of Real Property) Filed by Debtor Sorroeix, Inc.) IN-PERSON Hearing scheduled 01/27/2021 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
December 31, 2020 Minutes; Disposition: GRANTED. Order to be prepared by Steven Douglass. (related document(s)#12 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules/Statements or Provide Required Information Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Sorroeix, Inc. ). Order due by 1/14/2021. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
December 31, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#37 Response to (related document(s): #8 Motion for Adequate Protection, Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 59 Parcels of Real Property ) Filed by Trustee Michael P. Coury) IN-PERSON Hearing scheduled 01/27/2021 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
December 31, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#40 Objection to (related document(s): #18 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) ) Filed by U.S. Trustee (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)) IN-PERSON Hearing scheduled 01/27/2021 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
December 31, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#39 Objection to (related document(s): #18 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) ) Filed by Creditor PROPERTY FACTOR AUS, LLC) IN-PERSON Hearing scheduled 01/27/2021 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
December 31, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#41 Objection to (related document(s): #8 Motion for Adequate Protection, Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 59 Parcels of Real Property ) Filed by Creditor PROPERTY FACTOR AUS, LLC) IN-PERSON Hearing scheduled 01/27/2021 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
December 31, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#38 Response to (related document(s): #18 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) ) Filed by Trustee Michael P. Coury) IN-PERSON Hearing scheduled 01/27/2021 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
December 30, 2020 THIS ENTRY IS VOID. DUPLICATE ENTRY. Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#38 Response to (related document(s): #18 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) i> Filed by Trustee Michael P. Coury) Hearing scheduled 12/31/2020 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Modified on 12/30/2020 (Pulse, Deborah).
December 30, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTIVE ENTRY: (related document(s) THIS ENTRY IS VOID. DUPLICATE ENTRY. Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#38 Response to (related document(s): #18 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) i> Filed by Trustee Michael P. Coury) Hearing scheduled 12/31/2020 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Modified on 12/30/2020 .) (dap)
December 30, 2020 Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#38 Response to (related document(s): #18 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) ) Filed by Trustee Michael P. Coury) Hearing scheduled 12/31/2020 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
December 30, 2020 Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#37 Response to (related document(s): #8 Motion for Adequate Protection, Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 59 Parcels of Real Property ) Filed by Trustee Michael P. Coury) Hearing scheduled 12/31/2020 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
December 30, 2020 Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#40 Objection to (related document(s): #18 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) ) Filed by U.S. Trustee (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)) Hearing scheduled 12/31/2020 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
December 30, 2020 Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#41 Objection to (related document(s): #8 Motion for Adequate Protection, Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 59 Parcels of Real Property ) Filed by Creditor PROPERTY FACTOR AUS, LLC) Hearing scheduled 12/31/2020 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
December 30, 2020 Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#39 Objection to (related document(s): #18 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) ) Filed by Creditor PROPERTY FACTOR AUS, LLC) Hearing scheduled 12/31/2020 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
December 29, 2020 Filing 41 Objection to (related document(s): #8 Motion for Adequate Protection filed by Creditor Bridge SFR Loans, LLC, Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 59 Parcels of Real Property . Previous Receipt Number 36816761, Fee Amount Previously Paid $188,) Filed by Creditor PROPERTY FACTOR AUS, LLC (Bearman, Edward)
December 29, 2020 Filing 40 Objection to (related document(s): #18 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) . Filing Fee Due $188, filed by Debtor Sorroeix, Inc.) Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
December 29, 2020 Filing 39 Objection to (related document(s): #18 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) . Filing Fee Due $188, filed by Debtor Sorroeix, Inc.) Filed by Creditor PROPERTY FACTOR AUS, LLC (Bearman, Edward)
December 29, 2020 Filing 38 Response to (related document(s): #18 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) . Filing Fee Due $188, filed by Debtor Sorroeix, Inc.) Filed by Trustee Michael P. Coury (Coury, Michael)
December 29, 2020 Filing 37 Response to (related document(s): #8 Motion for Adequate Protection filed by Creditor Bridge SFR Loans, LLC, Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 59 Parcels of Real Property . Previous Receipt Number 36816761, Fee Amount Previously Paid $188,) Filed by Trustee Michael P. Coury (Coury, Michael)
December 29, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTIVE ENTRY: (related document(s)#36 Summary - Assets and Liabilities, Schedule A/B, (Schedule C), Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Declaration Concerning Debtor Schedules, Declaration re Corporation or Partnership, Statement Of Financial Affairs & Debtor Declaration, Attorney Fee Disclosure Statement, LIST OF EQUITY SECURITY HOLDERS Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Debtor Sorroeix, Inc.. (Douglass, Steven) EDITED DOCKET TEXT TO REMOVE SCHEDULE C AND ADD LIST OF EQUITY SECURITY HOLDERS TO MATCH ATTACHED PDF. Modified on 12/29/2020 .) (lnp)
December 29, 2020 All Completion/Missing Documents have been filed and all related deadlines have been satisfied. (lnp)
December 29, 2020 An Order GRANTING is to be filed by Steven Douglass (related document(s)#32 Application to Employ Tina Andrade of Fast Track Realty as Real Estate Professional Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Sorroeix, Inc. ) Order due by 1/12/2021. (dap)
December 28, 2020 Filing 36 Summary - Assets and Liabilities, Schedule A/B, (Schedule C), Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Declaration Concerning Debtor Schedules, Declaration re Corporation or Partnership, Statement Of Financial Affairs & Debtor Declaration, Attorney Fee Disclosure Statement, LIST OF EQUITY SECURITY HOLDERS Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Debtor Sorroeix, Inc.. (Douglass, Steven) EDITED DOCKET TEXT TO REMOVE SCHEDULE C AND ADD LIST OF EQUITY SECURITY HOLDERS TO MATCH ATTACHED PDF. Modified on 12/29/2020 (Pratt, Leslie).
December 28, 2020 Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#33 Objection to (related document(s): #8 Motion for Adequate Protection, Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 59 Parcels of Real Property) Filed by Debtor Sorroeix, Inc.) Hearing scheduled 12/31/2020 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
December 23, 2020 Filing 35 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#31 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 12/23/2020. (Admin.)
December 23, 2020 Filing 34 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#30 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 12/23/2020. (Admin.)
December 23, 2020 Filing 33 Objection to (related document(s): #8 Motion for Adequate Protection filed by Creditor Bridge SFR Loans, LLC, Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 59 Parcels of Real Property . Previous Receipt Number 36816761, Fee Amount Previously Paid $188,) Filed by Debtor Sorroeix, Inc. (Douglass, Steven)
December 23, 2020 Filing 32 Application to Employ Tina Andrade of Fast Track Realty as Real Estate Professional Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Sorroeix, Inc. (Douglass, Steven)
December 22, 2020 Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#29 Objection by Bridge SFR Loans, LLC to (related document(s): #18 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f)) (Wilson, Preston) Hearing scheduled 12/31/2020 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
December 22, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTIVE ENTRY: (related document(s)#29 Objection to (related document(s): #18 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) . Filing Fee Due $188, filed by Debtor Sorroeix, Inc.) (Filed by Debtor Sorroeix, Inc. (Wilson, Preston)EDITED DOCKET TEXT TO SHOW THE DOCUMENT WAS FILED BY PRESTON WILSON ON BEHALF OF BRIDGE SFR LOANS AND NOT BY THE DEBTOR Modified on 12/22/2020 .) (mjb)
December 21, 2020 Filing 31 Notice Of Hearing; (related document(s)#27 Application to Employ Harris Shelton Hanover Walsh, PLLC as Counsel for Debtor Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Sorroeix, Inc. ) Hearing scheduled 1/14/2021 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. Bar Date For Objections - 1/5/2021. (dap)
December 21, 2020 Filing 30 Notice Of Hearing; (related document(s)#26 Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 5828 Grassy Valley and 3746 Fern Ridge Filed by R. Lee Webber on behalf of Trident Realty Investments, LLC (Webber, R.)) Hearing scheduled 1/14/2021 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. Bar Date For Objections - 1/5/2021. (dap)
December 21, 2020 Filing 29 Objection to (related document(s): #18 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) . Filing Fee Due $188, filed by Debtor Sorroeix, Inc.) (Filed by Debtor Sorroeix, Inc. (Wilson, Preston)EDITED DOCKET TEXT TO SHOW THE DOCUMENT WAS FILED BY PRESTON WILSON ON BEHALF OF BRIDGE SFR LOANS AND NOT BY THE DEBTOR Modified on 12/22/2020 (Beacham, Melissa).
December 18, 2020 Filing 28 Certificate Of Service Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Debtor Sorroeix, Inc. (related document(s)#18 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) . Filing Fee Due $188,, #22 Notice Of Hearing). (Douglass, Steven)
December 18, 2020 Filing 27 Application to Employ Harris Shelton Hanover Walsh, PLLC as Counsel for Debtor Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Sorroeix, Inc. (Douglass, Steven)
December 18, 2020 Filing 26 Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 5828 Grassy Valley and 3746 Fern Ridge Filing Fee Due $188 Filed by R. Lee Webber on behalf of Trident Realty Investments, LLC (Webber, R.)
December 18, 2020 Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay(20-11492) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 188.00) filing fee. Receipt number 36867857, amount $ 188.00. (U.S. Treasury)
December 17, 2020 Filing 25 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#23 Order On Motion To Shorten Time) Notice Date 12/17/2020. (Admin.)
December 16, 2020 Filing 24 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#22 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 12/16/2020. (Admin.)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order Granting Motion To Shorten Time To Hear Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens (Related Doc #19) (mjb)
December 14, 2020 Filing 22 Notice Of Hearing; (related document(s)#18 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Sorroeix, Inc. ) Hearing scheduled 12/31/2020 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. Bar Date For Objections - 12/29/2020. (dap)
December 14, 2020 An Order is to be filed by Steven Douglass (related document(s)#19 Motion To Shorten Time for notice period for objections to Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Interests and Encumbrances; Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Sorroeix, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) Order due at this time. (lnp)
December 11, 2020 Filing 21 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#13 Order and Notice of Deadlines and Date Set for U.S.C. Section 1188(a) Status Conference.) Notice Date 12/11/2020. (Admin.)
December 11, 2020 Filing 20 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#14 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 12/11/2020. (Admin.)
December 11, 2020 Filing 19 Motion To Shorten Time for notice period for objections to Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Interests and Encumbrances; Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Sorroeix, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Douglass, Steven)
December 11, 2020 Filing 18 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) . Filing Fee Due $188, Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Sorroeix, Inc. (Douglass, Steven)
December 11, 2020 Receipt of Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f)(20-11492) [motion,msellfr] ( 188.00) filing fee. Receipt number 36840820, amount $ 188.00. (U.S. Treasury)
December 10, 2020 Filing 17 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#10 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 12/10/2020. (Admin.)
December 10, 2020 Filing 16 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors (related document(s)#11 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) Notice Date 12/10/2020. (Admin.)
December 9, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of 11 U.S.C. Section 341 Meeting of Creditors Telephonic Conference Filed by Carrie Ann Rohrscheib on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
December 9, 2020 Filing 14 Notice Of Hearing; (related document(s)#12 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules/Statements or Provide Required Information Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Sorroeix, Inc. ) Hearing scheduled 12/31/2020 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. Bar Date For Objections - 12/29/2020. (dap)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order and Notice of Deadlines and Date Set for U.S.C. Section 1188(a) Status Conference. Status hearing to be held on 1/14/2021 at 09:30 AM By telephone, if necessary. Pre Status Conference Report Due By 12/31/2020. (mjb)
December 8, 2020 Filing 12 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules/Statements or Provide Required Information Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Sorroeix, Inc. (Douglass, Steven)
December 8, 2020 Filing 11 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/29/2020 at 01:00 PM at By telephone, if necessary. Proof of Claims due by 3/9/2021. Government Proof of Claims due by 5/24/2021. (mjb)
December 8, 2020 Filing 10 Notice Of Hearing; (related document(s)#8 Motion for Adequate Protection , in addition to Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 59 Parcels of Real Property Filed by Preston Wilson on behalf of Bridge SFR Loans, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)) Hearing scheduled 12/31/2020 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. Bar Date For Objections - 12/29/2020. (dap)
December 8, 2020 Notice By The U.S. Trustee Setting The Meeting Of Creditors. Section 341 Meeting has been set on 12/29/2020 at 01:00 PM at Telephonically. (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
December 7, 2020 Filing 9 As required by 28 U.S.C. Section 586(a), the United States Trustee provides notice that the Initial Debtor Interview will be held on Thursday, December 10, 2020, Telephonically at 2:00 p.m. (LeSueur, Darlene)
December 7, 2020 Filing 8 Motion for Adequate Protection , in addition to Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 59 Parcels of Real Property . Previous Receipt Number 36816761, Fee Amount Previously Paid $188, Filed by Preston Wilson on behalf of Bridge SFR Loans, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Wilson, Preston)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee . Michael P. Coury added to the case. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Verified Statement) (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
December 7, 2020 REQUEST FOR CORRECTION BY FILER: (related document(s)#6 THIS ENTRY IS VOID; INSUFFICIENT EVENT CODES USED AND PDF DOES NOT INCLUDE PROPER CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; REQUEST FOR FILING PARTY TO FILE A NEW PLEADING; Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: Sorroiex,Inc. Filing Fee Due $188 Filed by Preston Wilson on behalf of Bridge SFR Loans, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)) (mjb)
December 4, 2020 Filing 6 THIS ENTRY IS VOID; INSUFFICIENT EVENT CODES USED AND PDF DOES NOT INCLUDE PROPER CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; REQUEST FOR FILING PARTY TO FILE A NEW PLEADING; Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: Sorroiex,Inc. Filing Fee Due $188 Filed by Preston Wilson on behalf of Bridge SFR Loans, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Wilson, Preston)
December 4, 2020 Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay(20-11492) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 188.00) filing fee. Receipt number 36816761, amount $ 188.00. (U.S. Treasury)
December 2, 2020 Filing 5 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#3 Update Deficiency Deadlines) Notice Date 12/02/2020. (Admin.)
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Carrie Ann Rohrscheib on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDEDNotice of Required Filing Fee and/or Deficient Filing. Deficiency Deadlines Updated to Indicate Incomplete Filings: Attorney Fee Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders, Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Statement of Financial Affairs and Debtor Declaration, Summary of Assets and Liabilities , Declaration Re: Corporation or Partnership (Form 202), Incomplete Filings Due by 12/14/2020. (lnm)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Required Filing Fee and/or Deficient Filing. Deficiency Deadlines Updated to Indicate Incomplete Filings: Attachment to Ch 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Form 201A, Attorney Fee Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders, Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Statement of Financial Affairs and Debtor Declaration, Summary of Assets and Liabilities , Declaration Re: Corporation or Partnership (Form 202), Incomplete Filings Due by 12/14/2020. (lnm)
November 30, 2020 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(20-11492) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 36797109, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual with deficiencies,. Filing Fee Due $1717, Filed by Sorroeix, Inc. Chapter 11 Small Business SubChapter V Plan due by 02/23/2021. (Douglass, Steven)
November 25, 2020 Matrix Filed by Steven N. Douglass on behalf of Debtor Sorroeix, Inc.. (Douglass, Steven)

Search for this case: Sorroeix, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Sorroeix, Inc.
Represented By: Steven N. Douglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Carrie Ann Rohrscheib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Michael P. Coury
Represented By: Michael P. Coury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?