West Alley BBQ Jackson LLC
Debtor: West Alley BBQ Jackson LLC
Us Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 1:2021bk10052
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jimmy L Croom
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Filing 42 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#40 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case) Notice Date 03/18/2021. (Admin.)
March 18, 2021 Filing 41 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#40 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case) Notice Date 03/18/2021. (Admin.)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case with Prejudice Pursuant to 11 USC 1112(b) and 349 And Notice of Entry Thereof (Related Doc #9) (lnp)
March 10, 2021 Minutes; Disposition: GRANTED WITH DISMISSAL UNDER 109(g) FOR 180 DAYS. Order to be prepared by Carrie Ann Rohrscheib. (related document(s)#9 Motion to Dismiss Case With Prejudice Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 1112(b) and 349 Filed by Carrie Ann Rohrscheib on behalf of U.S. Trustee (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - West Alley BBQ Jackson LLC Secretary of State Filing # 2 Exhibit B - West Alley BBQ LLC Secretary of State Filing) (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)) Order due by 3/24/2021. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
March 10, 2021 Minutes; Disposition: OVERRULED. (related document(s)#23 Objection to (related document(s): #9 Motion to Dismiss Case With Prejudice Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 1112(b) and 349) Filed by Debtor West Alley BBQ Jackson LLC) (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
March 10, 2021 Minutes; Disposition: MOOT. CASE HERETOFORE DISMISSED ON TRUSTEE'S MOTION. (related document(s)#26 Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: as to 1110 Vann Drive Real Property Filed by Ronald G. Steen Jr. on behalf of Arturo Onate, Jose Onate, Rafael Onate, Ricardo Onate (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit)) (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
March 8, 2021 Filing 39 Exhibit: for Hearing on 3/10/21 Joint Stipulated Filed by Carrie Ann Rohrscheib on behalf of U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee (related document(s)#9 Motion to Dismiss Case With Prejudice Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 1112(b) and 349, #26 Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: as to 1110 Vann Drive Real Property Filing Fee Due $188). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16 - Redacted #2 Exhibit 17 - Redacted #3 Exhibit 21 - Part 1 Redacted #4 Exhibit 21 - Part 2 Redacted) (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
March 8, 2021 Filing 38 Statement of Facts (Joint Stipulated) for Hearing on 3/10/21 Filed by Carrie Ann Rohrscheib on behalf of U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee (related document(s)#9 Motion to Dismiss Case With Prejudice Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 1112(b) and 349, #26 Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: as to 1110 Vann Drive Real Property Filing Fee Due $188). (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
March 5, 2021 Filing 37 Small Business Report Of Operations For Filing Period January 21-31, 2021 Filed by Thomas Harold Strawn Jr. on behalf of Debtor West Alley BBQ Jackson LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Monthly Financial Statment) (Strawn, Thomas)
March 5, 2021 Filing 36 The United States Trustee reports that the Meeting of Creditors required under 11 U.S.C. Section 341 has been held and conducted as scheduled. (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
March 4, 2021 Filing 35 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#32 Filing Deficiency Notice) Notice Date 03/04/2021. (Admin.)
March 4, 2021 Filing 34 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#31 Order On Motion To Shorten Time) Notice Date 03/04/2021. (Admin.)
March 4, 2021 Filing 33 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#32 Filing Deficiency Notice) Notice Date 03/04/2021. (Admin.)
March 2, 2021 Filing 32 Notice of Required Filing Fee and/or Deficient Filing. Issued to Ronald G. Steen Jr., Re: Order on Motion to Shorten Time, Due to: Duplicate Order. Order Previously filed with Court. (lnp)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order Granting Motion To Shorten Time (Related Doc #27) (lnp)
February 27, 2021 Filing 30 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#28 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 02/27/2021. (Admin.)
February 25, 2021 Filing 29 Notice of Required Filing Fee and/or Deficient Filing. Issued to Ronald G. Steen Jr., Re: Order on Motion to Shorten Time, Due to: Order does not have a 4" margin. (lnp)
February 25, 2021 Filing 28 Notice Of Hearing; (related document(s)#26 Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: as to 1110 Vann Drive Real Property Filed by Ronald G. Steen Jr. on behalf of Arturo Onate, Jose Onate, Rafael Onate, Ricardo Onate (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit)) IN-PERSON Hearing scheduled 3/10/2021 at 10:00 a.m., Room 342, Jackson, TN. Bar Date For Objections - 3/10/2021 at 10:00 a.m. (dap)
February 25, 2021 Filing 27 Motion To Shorten Time for Notice and Objections and to Set Hearing; Filed by Ronald G. Steen Jr. on behalf of Arturo Onate, Jose Onate, Rafael Onate, Ricardo Onate (Steen, Ronald)
February 25, 2021 An Order is to be filed by Ronald G. Steen, Jr. (related document(s)#27 Motion To Shorten Time for Notice and Objections and to Set Hearing; Filed by Ronald G. Steen Jr. on behalf of Arturo Onate, Jose Onate, Rafael Onate, Ricardo Onate ) Order due at this time. (lnp)
February 25, 2021 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#9 Motion to Dismiss Case With Prejudice Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 1112(b) and 349 Filed by Carrie Ann Rohrscheib on behalf of U.S. Trustee (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - West Alley BBQ Jackson LLC Secretary of State Filing # 2 Exhibit B - West Alley BBQ LLC Secretary of State Filing) (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)) IN-PERSON Hearing scheduled 3/10/2021 at 10:00 AM, Room 342, Jackson, TN. (dap)
February 25, 2021 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#23 Objection to (related document(s): #9 Motion to Dismiss Case With Prejudice Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 1112(b) and 349) Filed by Debtor West Alley BBQ Jackson LLC) IN-PERSON Hearing scheduled 3/10/2021 at 10:00 AM, Room 342, Jackson, TN. (dap)
February 24, 2021 Filing 26 Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: as to 1110 Vann Drive Real Property Filing Fee Due $188 Filed by Ronald G. Steen Jr. on behalf of Arturo Onate, Jose Onate, Rafael Onate, Ricardo Onate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit) (Steen, Ronald)
February 24, 2021 Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay(21-10052) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 188.00) filing fee. Receipt number 37082002, amount $ 188.00. (U.S. Treasury)
February 16, 2021 Filing 25 Notice Of Joinder Filed by Stuart Wilson-Patton on behalf of Tennessee Department of Revenue (related document(s)#9 Motion to Dismiss Case With Prejudice Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 1112(b) and 349 Filed by Carrie Ann Rohrscheib on behalf of U.S. Trustee (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - West Alley BBQ Jackson LLC Secretary of State Filing # 2 Exhibit B - West Alley BBQ LLC Secretary of State Filing) (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)). (Wilson-Patton, Stuart)
February 16, 2021 Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#23 Objection to (related document(s): #9 Motion to Dismiss Case With Prejudice Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 1112(b) and 349) Filed by Debtor West Alley BBQ Jackson LLC) Hearing scheduled 2/25/2021 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
February 13, 2021 Filing 24 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#22 Case Management Order) Notice Date 02/13/2021. (Admin.)
February 12, 2021 Filing 23 Objection to (related document(s): #9 Motion to Dismiss Case With Prejudice Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 1112(b) and 349 filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee) Filed by Debtor West Alley BBQ Jackson LLC (Strawn, Thomas)
February 11, 2021 Filing 22 Case Management Order (lnp)
February 11, 2021 Minutes; Disposition: CONDUCTED. Order To Be Prepared By the Court (related document(s)#7 Order And Notice Of Case Management Conference Combined with Related Orders and Notice of the Entry Thereof) (dap)
February 9, 2021 Filing 21 Notice of 11 U.S.C. Section 341 Meeting of Creditors Telephonic Conference Filed by Carrie Ann Rohrscheib on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
February 8, 2021 NOTICE OF CORRECTIVE ENTRY: (related document(s)#20 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor , Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , (Schedule C ), Schedule D: Non-Individual Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual. , Schedule G: Non-Individual Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H: Non-Individual Codebtors , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual , Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual Filed by Thomas Harold Strawn Jr. on behalf of Debtor West Alley BBQ Jackson LLC. (Strawn, Thomas)EDITED DOCKET TEXT TO REMOVE SCHEDULE C TO MATCH ATTACHED PDF. Modified on 2/8/2021 .) (lnp)
February 8, 2021 All Completion/Missing Documents have been filed and all related deadlines have been satisfied. (lnp)
February 8, 2021 REQUEST FOR CORRECTION BY FILER: (related document(s)#16 THIS ENTRY IS VOID. DEBTOR'S NAME AND CASE NUMBER ARE MISSING AS WELL AS TITLE OF DOCUMENT. REQUEST FILING PARTY TO FILE NEW PLEADING. Balance Sheet Filed by Thomas Harold Strawn Jr. on behalf of Debtor West Alley BBQ Jackson LLC. (Strawn, Thomas) Modified on 2/8/2021 .) (lnp)
February 5, 2021 Filing 20 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor , Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , (Schedule C ), Schedule D: Non-Individual Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual. , Schedule G: Non-Individual Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H: Non-Individual Codebtors , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual , Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual Filed by Thomas Harold Strawn Jr. on behalf of Debtor West Alley BBQ Jackson LLC. (Strawn, Thomas)EDITED DOCKET TEXT TO REMOVE SCHEDULE C TO MATCH ATTACHED PDF. Modified on 2/8/2021 (Pratt, Leslie).
February 5, 2021 Filing 19 Statement Of Debtor Pursuant to 11 USC Sec. 1116 Filed by Thomas Harold Strawn Jr. on behalf of Debtor West Alley BBQ Jackson LLC. (Strawn, Thomas)
February 5, 2021 Filing 16 THIS ENTRY IS VOID. DEBTOR'S NAME AND CASE NUMBER ARE MISSING AS WELL AS TITLE OF DOCUMENT. REQUEST FILING PARTY TO FILE NEW PLEADING. Balance Sheet Filed by Thomas Harold Strawn Jr. on behalf of Debtor West Alley BBQ Jackson LLC. (Strawn, Thomas) Modified on 2/8/2021 (Pratt, Leslie).
February 1, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Stuart Wilson-Patton on behalf of Tennessee Department of Revenue. (Wilson-Patton, Stuart)
February 1, 2021 Filing 14 Notice Of Joinder to Motion to Dismiss Filed by Ronald G. Steen Jr. on behalf of Arturo Onate, Jose Onate, Rafael Onate, Ricardo Onate (related document(s)#9 Motion to Dismiss Case With Prejudice Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 1112(b) and 349 Filed by Carrie Ann Rohrscheib on behalf of U.S. Trustee (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - West Alley BBQ Jackson LLC Secretary of State Filing # 2 Exhibit B - West Alley BBQ LLC Secretary of State Filing) (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Lease) #2 Exhibit Exhibit B (Gen Sessions Order) #3 Exhibit Exhibit C (Notice Letter)) (Steen, Ronald)
January 30, 2021 Filing 13 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#10 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 01/30/2021. (Admin.)
January 28, 2021 Filing 12 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#7 Order And Notice Of Case Management Conference (initial order on ch11 cases)) Notice Date 01/28/2021. (Admin.)
January 28, 2021 Filing 11 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors (related document(s)#6 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) Notice Date 01/28/2021. (Admin.)
January 28, 2021 Filing 10 Notice Of Hearing; (related document(s)#9 Motion to Dismiss Case With Prejudice Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 1112(b) and 349 Filed by Carrie Ann Rohrscheib on behalf of U.S. Trustee (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - West Alley BBQ Jackson LLC Secretary of State Filing # 2 Exhibit B - West Alley BBQ LLC Secretary of State Filing) (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)) Hearing scheduled 2/25/2021 at 09:30 AM, By telephone, if necessary. Bar Date For Objections - 2/16/2021. (dap)
January 27, 2021 Filing 9 Motion to Dismiss Case With Prejudice Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 1112(b) and 349 Filed by Carrie Ann Rohrscheib on behalf of U.S. Trustee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - West Alley BBQ Jackson LLC Secretary of State Filing #2 Exhibit B - West Alley BBQ LLC Secretary of State Filing) (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
January 26, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Ronald G. Steen Jr. on behalf of Ricardo Onate, Rafael Onate, Arturo Onate, Jose Onate. (Steen, Ronald)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order And Notice Of Case Management Conference Combined with Related Orders and Notice of the Entry Thereof Status hearing to be held on 2/11/2021 at 09:30 AM By telephone, if necessary. (lnp)
January 26, 2021 Filing 6 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/17/2021 at 01:30 PM at By telephone, if necessary. Proof of Claims due by 5/18/2021. Government Proof of Claims due by 7/20/2021. (lnp)
January 25, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Carrie Ann Rohrscheib on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
January 25, 2021 Notice By The U.S. Trustee Setting The Meeting Of Creditors. Section 341 Meeting has been set on 2/17/2021 at 01:30 PM at Telephonically. (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
January 24, 2021 Filing 4 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#3 Update Deficiency Deadlines) Notice Date 01/24/2021. (Admin.)
January 22, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Required Filing Fee and/or Deficient Filing. Deficiency Deadlines Updated to Indicate Incomplete Filings: Attorney Fee Disclosure Statement, Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Statement of Financial Affairs and Debtor Declaration, Summary of Assets and Liabilities , Declaration Re: Corporation or Partnership (Form 202), Incomplete Filings Due by 2/5/2021. (lnm)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 As required by 28 U.S.C. Section 586(a), the United States Trustee provides notice that the Initial Debtor Interview will be held on Monday, February 1, 2021 (telephonically) at 2 p.m. (LeSueur, Darlene)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual with deficiencies,. Filing Fee Due $1738, Filed by West Alley BBQ Jackson LLC Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 07/20/2021. Disclosure Statement due by 07/20/2021. (Strawn, Thomas)
January 21, 2021 Matrix Filed by Thomas Harold Strawn Jr. on behalf of Debtor West Alley BBQ Jackson LLC. (Strawn, Thomas)
January 21, 2021 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(21-10052) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number 36970235, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: West Alley BBQ Jackson LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: West Alley BBQ Jackson LLC
Represented By: Thomas Harold Strawn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Carrie Ann Rohrscheib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?