Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp
Debtor: Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp
Trustee: Timothy Stone
Us Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 2:2020bk24352
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: David S Kennedy
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Filing 77 Notice Of Hearing; (related document(s)#75 Application for Compensation to Accept Compensation for Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp, Debtor's Attorney, Period: to, Fee: $, Expenses: $2,500.00. Filed by John Edward Dunlap ) Hearing scheduled 11/17/2020 at 11:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. Bar Date For Objections - 11/10/2020. (tll)
October 30, 2020 Filing 76 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#74 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 10/30/2020. (Admin.)
October 30, 2020 Filing 75 Application for Compensation to Accept Compensation for Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp, Debtor's Attorney, Period: to, Fee: $, Expenses: $2,500.00. Filed by John Edward Dunlap (Dunlap, John)
October 28, 2020 Filing 74 Notice Of Hearing; (related document(s)#72 Amended Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit)) Hearing scheduled 11/17/2020 at 11:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. Bar Date For Objections - 11/10/2020. (tll)
October 28, 2020 Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#71 Response to (related document(s): #68 Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 66 houses used as rental properties Filing Fee Due $181 filed by Creditor Sultani Family Realty Trust) Filed by Debtor Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp) Hearing scheduled 11/17/2020 at 11:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (tll)
October 27, 2020 Filing 73 Status Report Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Debtor Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp. (Dunlap, John)
October 27, 2020 Filing 72 Amended Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit) (Dunlap, John)
October 27, 2020 Filing 71 Response to (related document(s): #68 Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 66 houses used as rental properties Filing Fee Due $181 filed by Creditor Sultani Family Realty Trust) Filed by Debtor Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp (Dunlap, John)
October 27, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#6 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)) Hearing scheduled 11/17/2020 at 11:00 AM, By telephone or Video Conference, if necessary. (tll) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 27, 2020 Notice Of Continuance related document(s) #15 Order and Notice of Deadlines and Date Set for U.S.C. Section 1188(a) Status Conference. Status hearing to be held on 11/17/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone, if necessary. Pre Status Conference Report Due By 10/13/2020. (tll) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 27, 2020 Minutes; Disposition: WITHDRAWN. Order to be prepared by John Edward Dunlap. (related document(s)#45 Objection To Claim 99,114 by Claimant City of Memphis Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Debtor Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp.). Order due by 11/10/2020. (tll) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 27, 2020 Minutes; Disposition: MOOT. Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#63 Response Filed by Creditor City of Memphis (related document(s)#45 Objection To Claim 99,114 by Claimant City of Memphis ) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3)) (tll) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 27, 2020 Minutes; Disposition: MOOT. Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#62 Response Filed by Creditor Shelby County Trustee (related document(s)#25 Objection To Claim 33,44 by Claimant Shelby County Trustee.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3)) (tll) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 27, 2020 Minutes; Disposition: WITHDRAWN. Order to be prepared by John Edward Dunlap. (related document(s)#25 Objection To Claim 33,44 by Claimant Shelby County Trustee Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Debtor Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp.). Order due by 11/10/2020. (tll) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 25, 2020 Filing 70 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#69 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 10/25/2020. (Admin.)
October 23, 2020 Filing 69 Notice Of Hearing; (related document(s)#68 Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 66 houses used as rental properties Filing Fee Due $181 Filed by Ricky Hutchens on behalf of Sultani Family Realty Trust (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit # 8 Exhibit)) Hearing scheduled 11/17/2020 at 11:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. Bar Date For Objections - 11/10/2020. (tll)
October 22, 2020 Filing 68 Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 66 houses used as rental properties Filing Fee Due $181 Filed by Ricky Hutchens on behalf of Sultani Family Realty Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit #4 Exhibit #5 Exhibit #6 Exhibit #7 Exhibit #8 Exhibit) (Hutchens, Ricky)
October 22, 2020 Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay(20-24352) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 181.00) filing fee. Receipt number 36668495, amount $ 181.00. (U.S. Treasury)
October 15, 2020 Filing 67 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#65 Order on Application to Employ) Notice Date 10/15/2020. (Admin.)
October 15, 2020 Filing 66 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#64 Order On Motion To Shorten Time) Notice Date 10/15/2020. (Admin.)
October 14, 2020 Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#63 Response Filed by Creditor City of Memphis (related document(s)#45 Objection To Claim 99,114 by Claimant City of Memphis ) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3)) Hearing scheduled 10/27/2020 at 10:00 AM, by telephone or videoconference, if necessary. (dap)
October 14, 2020 Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#62 Response Filed by Creditor Shelby County Trustee (related document(s)#25 Objection To Claim 33,44 by Claimant Shelby County Trustee.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3)) Hearing scheduled 10/27/2020 at 10:00 AM, by telephone or videoconference, if necessary. (dap)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order Granting Application for Order Under 11 U.S.C. 372(a) and 329 Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Saranto Calamas as Accountant for the Debtor (Related Doc #59) Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp (klc)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Order Granting Motion To Shorten Time to Set a Hearing on Amended Motion for Use of Cash Collateral (Related Doc #8) Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp (klc)
October 13, 2020 Filing 63 Response Filed by Creditor City of Memphis (related document(s)#45 Objection To Claim 99,114 by Claimant City of Memphis Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Debtor Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 #2 Exhibit 2 #3 Exhibit 3) (Noel, Elijah)
October 13, 2020 Filing 62 Response Filed by Creditor Shelby County Trustee (related document(s)#25 Objection To Claim 33,44 by Claimant Shelby County Trustee Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Debtor Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 #2 Exhibit 2 #3 Exhibit 3) (Noel, Elijah)
October 13, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#22 Objection to (related document(s): #4 Amended Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp) Filed by U.S. Trustee) Hearing scheduled 11/24/2020 at 11:00 AM, By telephone of Video Conference, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 13, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#4 Amended Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp ) Hearing scheduled 11/24/2020 at 11:00 AM, By telephone or Video Conference, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 13, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#24 Objection to (related document(s): #4 Amended Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral) Filed by Creditor Sultani Family Realty Trust) Hearing scheduled 11/24/2020 at 11:00 AM, By telephone or Video Conference, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 13, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#6 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)) Hearing scheduled 10/27/2020 at 11:00 AM, By telephone or Video Conference, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER PAST DUE: Order was to have been previously submitted by John Dunlap (related document(s)#8 Motion To Shorten Time For a hearing on Amended Motion for Use of Cash Collateral; Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp ) (klc)
October 8, 2020 Filing 61 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Elijah Noel Jr. on behalf of City of Memphis. (Noel, Elijah)
October 8, 2020 Filing 60 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Elijah Noel Jr. on behalf of Shelby County Trustee. (Noel, Elijah)
October 8, 2020 An Order GRANTING is to be filed by John Dunlap (related document(s)#59 Application to Employ Saranto Calamas as Accountant (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)) (dap)
October 6, 2020 Filing 59 Application to Employ Saranto Calamas as Accountant Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Dunlap, John)
October 2, 2020 Filing 58 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#46 Order on Application to Employ) Notice Date 10/02/2020. (Admin.)
October 2, 2020 Filing 57 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#47 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 10/02/2020. (Admin.)
October 1, 2020 Filing 56 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#44 Order on Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral) Notice Date 10/01/2020. (Admin.)
September 30, 2020 Filing 55 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#43 Notice Of Deficient Claim) Notice Date 09/30/2020. (Admin.)
September 30, 2020 Filing 54 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#42 Notice Of Deficient Claim) Notice Date 09/30/2020. (Admin.)
September 30, 2020 Filing 53 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#41 Notice Of Deficient Claim) Notice Date 09/30/2020. (Admin.)
September 30, 2020 Filing 52 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#40 Notice Of Deficient Claim) Notice Date 09/30/2020. (Admin.)
September 30, 2020 Filing 51 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#39 Notice Of Deficient Claim) Notice Date 09/30/2020. (Admin.)
September 30, 2020 Filing 50 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#38 Notice Of Deficient Claim) Notice Date 09/30/2020. (Admin.)
September 30, 2020 Filing 49 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#37 Notice Of Deficient Claim) Notice Date 09/30/2020. (Admin.)
September 30, 2020 Filing 48 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#36 Notice Of Deficient Claim) Notice Date 09/30/2020. (Admin.)
September 30, 2020 Filing 47 Notice Of Hearing; (related document(s)#45 Objection To Claim 99,114 by Claimant City of Memphis Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Debtor Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp.) Hearing scheduled 10/27/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. Bar Date For Objections - 10/19/2020. (dap)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order Granting Application for Order Under 11 U.S.C. 327(a) and 329 Authorizing the Employment and Retention of John E. Dunlap as Attorney for the Debtor in Possession (Related Doc #2) (klc)
September 30, 2020 Minutes; Disposition: GRANTED. Order to be prepared by John Dunlap. (related document(s)#2 Application to Employ John E. Dunlap as Attorney for Debtor Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)) Order due by 10/14/2020. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
September 29, 2020 Filing 45 Objection To Claim 99,114 by Claimant City of Memphis Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Debtor Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp. (Dunlap, John)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order Granting Amended Emergency Motion for Interim Use of Cash Collateral (Related Doc #4) (klc)
September 28, 2020 Filing 43 Notification Of Deficient Claim RE: Claim 128 Filed By City of Memphis due to Amount on pdf does not match that listed on claims register (klc)
September 28, 2020 Filing 42 Notification Of Deficient Claim RE: Claim 124 Filed By City of Memphis due to Amount on pdf does not match that listed on claims register (klc)
September 28, 2020 Filing 41 Notification Of Deficient Claim RE: Claim 122 Filed By City of Memphis due to Amount on pdf does not match that listed on claims register (klc)
September 28, 2020 Filing 40 Notification Of Deficient Claim RE: Claim 121 Filed By City of Memphis due to Amount on pdf does not match that listed on claims register (klc)
September 28, 2020 Filing 39 Notification Of Deficient Claim RE: Claim 111 Filed By City of Memphis due to Amount on pdf does not match that listed on claims register (klc)
September 28, 2020 Filing 38 Notification Of Deficient Claim RE: Claim 109 Filed By City of Memphis due to Amount on pdf does not match that listed on claims register (klc)
September 28, 2020 Filing 37 Notification Of Deficient Claim RE: Claim 106 Filed By City of Memphis due to Amount on pdf does not match that listed on claims register (klc)
September 28, 2020 Filing 36 Notification Of Deficient Claim RE: Claim 100 Filed By City of Memphis due to Amount on pdf does not match that listed on claims register (klc)
September 26, 2020 Filing 35 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#30 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 09/26/2020. (Admin.)
September 25, 2020 Filing 34 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#29 Notice Of Deficient Claim) Notice Date 09/25/2020. (Admin.)
September 25, 2020 Filing 33 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#28 Notice Of Deficient Claim) Notice Date 09/25/2020. (Admin.)
September 25, 2020 Filing 32 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#27 Notice Of Deficient Claim) Notice Date 09/25/2020. (Admin.)
September 25, 2020 Filing 31 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#26 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 09/25/2020. (Admin.)
September 24, 2020 Filing 30 Notice Of Hearing Resetting (related document(s)#2 Application to Employ John E. Dunlap as Attorney for Debtor Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)) Reset Hearing scheduled 9/30/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
September 23, 2020 Filing 29 Notification Of Deficient Claim RE: Claim 88 Filed By City of Memphis due to Amount on pdf does not match that listed on claims register. (klc)
September 23, 2020 Filing 28 Notification Of Deficient Claim RE: Claim 74 Filed By City of Memphis due to The amount on pdf does match that on claims register. (klc)
September 23, 2020 Filing 27 Notification Of Deficient Claim RE: Claim 73 Filed By City of Memphis due to Amount on pdf does not match that listed on claims register. (klc)
September 23, 2020 Filing 26 Notice Of Hearing; (related document(s)#25 Objection To Claim 33,44 by Claimant Shelby County Trustee Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Debtor Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp.) Hearing scheduled 10/27/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. Bar Date For Objections - 10/19/2020. (dap)
September 22, 2020 Filing 25 Objection To Claim 33,44 by Claimant Shelby County Trustee Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Debtor Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp. (Dunlap, John)
September 22, 2020 Notice Of Continuance AND INTERIM ORDER TO BE SUBMITTED BY John Dunlap (related document(s)#4 Amended Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp ) Hearing scheduled 10/13/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. Bar Date For Objections - 9/21/2020. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
September 22, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#24 Objection to (related document(s): #4 Amended Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral) Filed by Creditor Sultani Family Realty Trust) Hearing scheduled 10/13/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
September 22, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#22 Objection to (related document(s): #4 Amended Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp) Filed by U.S. Trustee) Hearing scheduled 10/13/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
September 21, 2020 Filing 24 Objection to (related document(s): #4 Amended Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp) Filed by Creditor Sultani Family Realty Trust (Hutchens, Ricky)
September 21, 2020 Filing 23 Cash Flow Statement for Small Business Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Debtor Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp. (Dunlap, John)
September 21, 2020 Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#24 Objection to (related document(s): #4 Amended Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral) Filed by Creditor Sultani Family Realty Trust) Hearing scheduled 9/22/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
September 16, 2020 Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#22 Objection to (related document(s): #4 Amended Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp) Filed by U.S. Trustee) Hearing scheduled 9/22/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
September 15, 2020 Filing 22 Objection to (related document(s): #3 Emergency Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp, #4 Amended Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp) Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee (Walker, Jamaal)
September 14, 2020 Filing 21 As required by 28 U.S.C. Section 586(a), the United States Trustee provides notice that the Initial Debtor Interview will be held on Thursday, September 17, 2020, Telephonically at 2 p.m. (LeSueur, Darlene)
September 13, 2020 Filing 20 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#15 Order and Notice of Deadlines and Date Set for U.S.C. Section 1188(a) Status Conference.) Notice Date 09/13/2020. (Admin.)
September 13, 2020 Filing 19 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors (related document(s)#14 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) Notice Date 09/13/2020. (Admin.)
September 11, 2020 Filing 18 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#11 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 09/11/2020. (Admin.)
September 11, 2020 Filing 17 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#10 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 09/11/2020. (Admin.)
September 11, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of 11 U.S.C. Section 341 Meeting of Creditors Telephonic Conference Filed by Carrie Ann Rohrscheib on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order and Notice of Deadlines and Date Set for U.S.C. Section 1188(a) Status Conference. Status hearing to be held on 10/27/2020 at 10:00 AM at By telephone, if necessary. Pre Status Conference Report Due By 10/13/2020. (klc)
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/7/2020 at 09:45 AM at By telephone, if necessary. Proof of Claims due by 12/16/2020. Government Proof of Claims due by 3/3/2021. (klc)
September 11, 2020 Timothy Stone added as trustee to case (klc)
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#5 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 09/10/2020. (Admin.)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee Timothy Stone.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Verified Statement of Timothy Stone) (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
September 10, 2020 Notice By The U.S. Trustee Setting The Meeting Of Creditors. Section 341 Meeting has been set on 10/7/2020 at 09:30 AM at Telephonically Number: 866-822-8012 Passcode: 9344194. (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 Notice Of Hearing; (related document(s)#6 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)) Hearing scheduled 10/13/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. Bar Date For Objections - 10/5/2020. (dap)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 Notice Of Hearing; (related document(s)#4 Amended Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp) Hearing scheduled 9/22/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. Bar Date For Objections - 9/21/2020. (dap)
September 9, 2020 An Order GRANTING is to be filed by John Dunlap (related document(s)#8 Motion To Shorten Time For a hearing on Amended Motion for Use of Cash Collateral) (dap)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Carrie Ann Rohrscheib on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 Motion To Shorten Time For a hearing on Amended Motion for Use of Cash Collateral; Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp (Dunlap, John)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jamaal M. Walker on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Walker, Jamaal)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to Assume Lease or Executory Contract Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Dunlap, John)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 Notice Of Hearing; (related document(s)#2 Application to Employ John E. Dunlap as Attorney for Debtor Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)) Hearing scheduled 9/29/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. Bar Date For Objections - 9/22/2020. (dap)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 Amended Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp (Dunlap, John)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 Emergency Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp (Dunlap, John)
September 8, 2020 REQUEST FOR CORRECTION BY FILER: VOLUNTARY PETITION INDICATES FEE PAID. AT THIS TIME, NO FEE HAS BEEN RECEIVED BY THE COURT. FILING FEE MUST BE TENDERED ASAP TO AVOID BEING BLOCKED FROM FILING IN CM/ECF UNTIL FEE IS PAID IN FULL. Filing Fees Due By 9/23/2020 (klc)
September 8, 2020 Filing Fee Paid Receipt # 355656, in the amount of $1717.00, by John Dunlap (CM) (CRECF)
September 8, 2020 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(20-24352) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 355656, amount $1717.00. (McNeil)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Employ John E. Dunlap as Attorney for Debtor Filed by John Edward Dunlap on behalf of Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Dunlap, John)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Filing Fee Due $1717, Filed by Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp Chapter 11 Small Business SubChapter V Plan due by 12/3/2020. (Dunlap, John)

Search for this case: Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Clear The Way Supportive Housing Corp
Represented By: John Edward Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Timothy Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Jamaal M. Walker
Represented By: Carrie Ann Rohrscheib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?