EAS Graceland, LLC
Debtor: EAS Graceland, LLC
Us Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 2:2020bk24484
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: David S Kennedy
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Filing 71 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Elijah Noel Jr. on behalf of City of Memphis. (Noel, Elijah)
November 9, 2020 Filing 70 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Elijah Noel Jr. on behalf of Shelby County Trustee. (Noel, Elijah)
November 6, 2020 Filing 69 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#67 Order on Application to Employ) Notice Date 11/06/2020. (Admin.)
November 6, 2020 Filing 68 Amended/Corrected Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition as to remove single-asset real estate designation Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of Debtor EAS Graceland, LLC. (Coury, Michael)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Order Granting Application to Employ Ten-X, Inc. As Auctioneer(Related Doc #59) (ana)
November 3, 2020 Minutes; Disposition: GRANTED. Order to be prepared by Michael P. Coury. (related document(s)#39 Application to Employ Glankler Brown PLLC as Attorneys for Debtor Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of EAS Graceland, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael P. Coury)). Order due by 11/17/2020. (tll) Auto-docketed(CPA)
November 3, 2020 Minutes; Disposition: CONSENT ORDER. Order to be prepared by Ricky Hutchens. (related document(s)#59 Application to Employ Ten, X, Inc. and Re/Max Experts as Auctioneer and Real Estate Broker Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of EAS Graceland, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Ten_X, Inc.Marketing Agreement # 2 Exhibit 2- Declaration of Steven Senft # 3 Exhibit 3- Re/Max Listing Agreement # 4 Exhibit 4- Declaration of Rena Frulla)). Order due by 11/17/2020. (tll) Auto-docketed(CPA)
November 3, 2020 Minutes; Disposition: CONSENT ORDER. Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#61 Objection to (related document(s): #59 Application to Employ Ten, X, Inc. and Re/Max Experts as Auctioneer and Real Estate Broker filed by Debtor EAS Graceland, LLC) Filed by Creditor iBorrow Reit, L.P.) (tll) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 27, 2020 All Completion/Missing Documents have been filed and all related deadlines have been satisfied. (ana)
October 26, 2020 Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#61 Objection to (related document(s): #59 Application to Employ Ten, X, Inc. and Re/Max Experts as Auctioneer and Real Estate Broker filed by Debtor EAS Graceland, LLC) Filed by Creditor iBorrow Reit, L.P.) Hearing scheduled 11/3/2020 at 11:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (tll)
October 25, 2020 Filing 66 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#62 Order On Motion To Shorten Time) Notice Date 10/25/2020. (Admin.)
October 25, 2020 Filing 65 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#63 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 10/25/2020. (Admin.)
October 23, 2020 Filing 64 Report Of Operations For Filing Period September Filed by Ricky Hutchens on behalf of Debtor EAS Graceland, LLC. (Hutchens, Ricky)
October 23, 2020 Filing 63 Notice Of Hearing; (related document(s)#59 Application to Employ Ten, X, Inc. and Re/Max Experts as Auctioneer and Real Estate Broker Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of EAS Graceland, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Ten_X, Inc.Marketing Agreement # 2 Exhibit 2- Declaration of Steven Senft # 3 Exhibit 3- Re/Max Listing Agreement # 4 Exhibit 4- Declaration of Rena Frulla)) Hearing scheduled 11/3/2020 at 11:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. Bar Date For Objections - 10/30/2020. (tll)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order Granting Motion To Shorten Time (Related Doc #60) (ana)
October 23, 2020 Filing 61 Objection to (related document(s): #59 Application to Employ Ten, X, Inc. and Re/Max Experts as Auctioneer and Real Estate Broker filed by Debtor EAS Graceland, LLC) Filed by Creditor iBorrow Reit, L.P. (Cochran, Ryan)
October 21, 2020 Filing 60 Motion To Shorten Time Employ Auctioneer and Real Estate Broker; Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of EAS Graceland, LLC (Coury, Michael)
October 21, 2020 Filing 59 Application to Employ Ten, X, Inc. and Re/Max Experts as Auctioneer and Real Estate Broker Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of EAS Graceland, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Ten_X, Inc.Marketing Agreement #2 Exhibit 2- Declaration of Steven Senft #3 Exhibit 3- Re/Max Listing Agreement #4 Exhibit 4- Declaration of Rena Frulla) (Coury, Michael)
October 19, 2020 Filing 58 The United States Trustee reports that at this time, despite diligent efforts to contact eligible holders of unsecured claims, there has not been sufficient willingness to serve on a committee of unsecured creditors in this case. Accordingly, the United States Trustee is unable to appoint a committee pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1102(a) at this time. (Walker, Jamaal)
October 19, 2020 Filing 57 The United States Trustee reports that the Meeting of Creditors required under 11 U.S.C. Section 341 has been held and conducted as scheduled. (Walker, Jamaal)
October 18, 2020 Filing 56 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#52 Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules) Notice Date 10/18/2020. (Admin.)
October 18, 2020 Filing 55 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#51 Agreed / Consent Order) Notice Date 10/18/2020. (Admin.)
October 17, 2020 Filing 54 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#48 Interim Order) Notice Date 10/17/2020. (Admin.)
October 17, 2020 Filing 53 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#47 Interim Order) Notice Date 10/17/2020. (Admin.)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information (Related Doc #32) Incomplete Filings Due by 10/9/2020. (ana)
October 16, 2020 Filing 51 Agreed Order Resolving Adequate Protection Assurance Of Future Performance As To Memphis Light Gas & Water Division Filed by Stephanie Green Cole on behalf of Creditor Memphis Light, Gas & Water Division (ana)
October 15, 2020 Filing 50 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#45 Notice of Documents that Remain Missing or Incomplete) Notice Date 10/15/2020. (Admin.)
October 15, 2020 Filing 49 Exhibit: Budget for Second Interim Order to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Ricky Hutchens on behalf of Debtor EAS Graceland, LLC (related document(s)#48 Interim Order). (Hutchens, Ricky)
October 15, 2020 Filing 48 Second Interim Order Authorizing Use Of Cash Collateral, Granting Adequate Protecting, And Granting Related Relief. (related document(s):#17 Motion to Use Cash Collateral) (ams)
October 15, 2020 Filing 47 Interim Order Authorizing Use Of Cash Collateral, Granting Adequate Protecting, And Granting Related Relief. (related document(s):#17 Motion to Use Cash Collateral) (ams)
October 13, 2020 Filing 46 Attachment to Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy under Chapter 11 - Form 201A Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of Debtor EAS Graceland, LLC. (Coury, Michael)
October 13, 2020 Filing 45 Notice of Documents that Remain Missing or Incomplete: Voluntary Petition Attachment - Form 201A, (ana)
October 13, 2020 Notice Of Continuance and INTERIM ORDER to be submitted by Ricky Hutches/Michael Coury (related document(s)#17 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of EAS Graceland, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Cash Flow Pro Forma Budget)) Hearing scheduled 11/17/2020 at 11:00 AM, By telephone or Video Conference, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 13, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#27 Objection to (related document(s): #17 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral) Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee) Hearing scheduled 11/17/2020 at 11:00 AM, By telephone or Video Conference, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 13, 2020 Minutes; Disposition: GRANTED. Order to be prepared by Ricky Hutchens. (related document(s)#32 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules/Statements or Provide Required Information Filed by Ricky Hutchens on behalf of EAS Graceland, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) Order due by 10/27/2020. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 10, 2020 Filing 44 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#42 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 10/10/2020. (Admin.)
October 9, 2020 Filing 43 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual , Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D: Non-Individual Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual. , Schedule G: Non-Individual Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H: Non-Individual Codebtors , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor , Equity Security Holders , Matrix Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of Debtor EAS Graceland, LLC. (Coury, Michael)
October 8, 2020 Filing 42 Notice Of Hearing; (related document(s)#39 Application to Employ Glankler Brown PLLC as Attorneys for Debtor Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of EAS Graceland, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael P. Coury)) Hearing scheduled 11/3/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. Bar Date For Objections - 10/26/2020. (dap)
October 6, 2020 Filing 41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice , Filing Fee Due $10 Filed by Caitlin C. Conklin on behalf of Travelodge Hotels, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Caitlin C. Conklin in Support #2 Proposed Order) (Conklin, Caitlin)
October 6, 2020 Filing 40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice , Filing Fee Due $10 Filed by David S. Catuogno on behalf of Travelodge Hotels, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David S. Catuogno in Support #2 Proposed Order) (Catuogno, David)
October 6, 2020 Filing 39 Application to Employ Glankler Brown PLLC as Attorneys for Debtor Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of EAS Graceland, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael P. Coury) (Coury, Michael)
October 6, 2020 Receipt of Motion to Appear pro hac vice (Appearance of 1(one) Attorney ONLY)(20-24484) [motion,mprohac2] ( 10.00) filing fee. Receipt number 36604694, amount $ 10.00. (U.S. Treasury)
October 6, 2020 Receipt of Motion to Appear pro hac vice (Appearance of 1(one) Attorney ONLY)(20-24484) [motion,mprohac2] ( 10.00) filing fee. Receipt number 36604656, amount $ 10.00. (U.S. Treasury)
October 3, 2020 Filing 38 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#35 Case Management Order) Notice Date 10/03/2020. (Admin.)
October 2, 2020 Filing 37 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#34 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 10/02/2020. (Admin.)
October 2, 2020 Filing 36 Notice of Required Filing Fee and/or Deficient Filing. Issued to Ricky L. Hutchens, Re: Interim Order Authorizing Use Of Cash Collateral Granting Adequate Protectio And Granting Related Relief, Due to: Attached Exhibit Must Be Filed As A Seperate Document.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (ana)
October 1, 2020 Filing 35 Case Management Order (ams)
September 30, 2020 Filing 34 Notice Of Hearing; (related document(s)#32 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules/Statements or Provide Required Information Filed by Ricky Hutchens on behalf of EAS Graceland, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) Hearing scheduled 10/13/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. Bar Date For Objections - 10/9/2020. (dap)
September 30, 2020 Filing 33 Request for Notice Filed by Travelodge Hotels, Inc.. (Conklin, Caitlin)
September 30, 2020 Minutes; Disposition: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONDUCTED. Court to prepare the order. (related document(s)#4 Order And Notice Of Case Management Conference ) (dap)
September 30, 2020 Notice Of Continuance and Interim Order to be submitted by Michael Coury (related document(s)#17 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of EAS Graceland, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Cash Flow Pro Forma Budget)) Hearing scheduled 10/13/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
September 30, 2020 Minutes; Disposition: RESOLVED. (related document(s)#26 Objection to (related document(s): #17 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral) Filed by Creditor iBorrow Reit, L.P.) (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
September 30, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#27 Objection to (related document(s): #17 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral) Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee) Hearing scheduled 10/13/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
September 29, 2020 Filing 32 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules/Statements or Provide Required Information Filed by Ricky Hutchens on behalf of EAS Graceland, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hutchens, Ricky)
September 28, 2020 Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#27 Objection to (related document(s): #17 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral) Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee) Hearing scheduled 9/30/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
September 28, 2020 Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#26 Objection to (related document(s): #17 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral) Filed by Creditor iBorrow Reit, L.P.) Hearing scheduled 9/30/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
September 26, 2020 Filing 31 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#25 Agreed / Consent Order) Notice Date 09/26/2020. (Admin.)
September 26, 2020 Filing 30 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#22 Order On Motion To Shorten Time) Notice Date 09/26/2020. (Admin.)
September 26, 2020 Filing 29 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#23 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 09/26/2020. (Admin.)
September 25, 2020 Filing 28 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#19 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 09/25/2020. (Admin.)
September 25, 2020 Filing 27 Objection to (related document(s): #17 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor EAS Graceland, LLC) Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee (Walker, Jamaal)
September 24, 2020 Filing 26 Objection to (related document(s): #17 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor EAS Graceland, LLC) Filed by Creditor iBorrow Reit, L.P. (Cochran, Ryan)
September 24, 2020 Filing 25 Agreed Order Allowing The Debtor To Pay Certain Pre-Petition Wages And Salaries And Reimburse Certain Financial Institutions For Bounced Check Related To Paying And Directing Banks and Other Financial Institutions To Honor All Related Checks and Electronic Payment Requests Filed by Ricky Hutchens on behalf of Debtor EAS Graceland, LLC (related document(s):#20 Motion to Pay Prepetition Employee Wages) (ana)
September 24, 2020 Filing 24 Notice Of Hearing; (related document(s)#20 Emergency Motion to Pay Prepetition Employee Wages Filed by Ricky Hutchens on behalf of EAS Graceland, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Laure Marmontel)) Hearing scheduled 9/30/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
September 24, 2020 Filing 23 Notice Of Preliminary Hearing Resetting (related document(s)#17 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of EAS Graceland, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Cash Flow Pro Forma Budget)) Reset Preliminary Hearing scheduled 9/30/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order Granting Motion To Shorten Time For Hearing On Debtors Motion To Authorize Debtor To Use Cash Collateral (Related Doc #18) (ana)
September 24, 2020 Notice Of Resetting (related document(s)#4 Order And Notice Of Case Management Conference Combined with Related Orders and Notice of the Entry Thereof )) Reset Status Hearing scheduled 9/30/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
September 23, 2020 Filing 21 Emergency Motion To Shorten Time On on Debtor's Emergency Motion for Order (a) Authorizing the Debtor to Pay Certain Pre-petition (I) Wages and Salaries and Reimburse Certain Financial Institutions for Bounced Checks Related to Paying Pre-petition Wages and Salaries and (b) Authorizing and Directing Banks and Other Financial Institutions to Honor all Related Checks and Electronic Payment Requests; Filed by Ricky Hutchens on behalf of EAS Graceland, LLC (Hutchens, Ricky)
September 23, 2020 Filing 20 Emergency Motion to Pay Prepetition Employee Wages Filed by Ricky Hutchens on behalf of EAS Graceland, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit Declaration of Laure Marmontel) (Hutchens, Ricky)
September 23, 2020 Filing 19 Notice Of Preliminary Hearing; (related document(s)#17 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of EAS Graceland, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Cash Flow Pro Forma Budget)) Preliminary Hearing scheduled 9/29/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
September 22, 2020 Filing 18 Emergency Motion To Shorten Time For Hearing on Emergency Motion to Authorize Use of Cash Collateral; Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of EAS Graceland, LLC (Coury, Michael)
September 22, 2020 Filing 17 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of EAS Graceland, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Cash Flow Pro Forma Budget) (Coury, Michael)
September 22, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Ryan K Cochran on behalf of iBorrow Reit, L.P.. (Cochran, Ryan)
September 21, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Ricky Hutchens on behalf of EAS Graceland, LLC. (Hutchens, Ricky)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#4 Order And Notice Of Case Management Conference (initial order on ch11 cases)) Notice Date 09/18/2020. (Admin.)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#2 Update Deficiency Deadlines) Notice Date 09/18/2020. (Admin.)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors (related document(s)#6 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) Notice Date 09/18/2020. (Admin.)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 THIS ENTRY IS VOID. DOCKETED IN THIS CASE IN ERROR. BNC WAS NOT GENERATED. Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/14/2020 at 10:00 AM at By telephone, if necessary. Proof of Claims due by 1/12/2021. Government Proof of Claims due by 3/15/2021. (ana) Modified on 9/18/2020 (Avent, April).
September 18, 2020 NOTICE OF CORRECTIVE ENTRY: (related document(s)#11 THIS ENTRY IS VOID. DOCKETED IN THIS CASE IN ERROR. BNC WAS NOT GENERATED. Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/14/2020 at 10:00 AM at By telephone, if necessary. Proof of Claims due by 1/12/2021. Government Proof of Claims due by 3/15/2021. (ana) Modified on 9/18/2020 .) (ana)
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of 11 U.S.C. Section 341 Metting of Creditors Telephonic Conference Filed by Jamaal M. Walker on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Walker, Jamaal)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Notice Filed by Travelodge Hotels, Inc.. (Catuogno, David)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Notice Filed by Travelodge Hotels, Inc.. (Eliades, Daniel)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 As required by 28 U.S.C. Section 586(a), the United States Trustee provides notice that the Initial Debtor Interview will be held on Thursday, September 24, 2020, Telephonically at 10:00 a.m. (LeSueur, Darlene)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/14/2020 at 10:00 AM at Room 400, Memphis, TN. Proof of Claims due by 1/12/2021. Government Proof of Claims due by 3/15/2021. (ana)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jamaal M. Walker on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Walker, Jamaal)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order And Notice Of Case Management Conference Combined with Related Orders and Notice of the Entry Thereof Status hearing to be held on 9/29/2020 at 10:00 AM By telephone, if necessary. (ana)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Carrie Ann Rohrscheib on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Required Filing Fee and/or Deficient Filing. Deficiency Deadlines Updated to Indicate Incomplete Filings: Attachment to Ch 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Form 201A, Attorney Fee Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders, Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Statement of Financial Affairs and Debtor Declaration, Summary of Assets and Liabilities , Declaration Re: Corporation or Partnership (Form 202), Incomplete Filings Due by 9/30/2020. (ana)
September 16, 2020 Notice By The U.S. Trustee Setting The Meeting Of Creditors. Section 341 Meeting has been set on 10/14/2020 at 10:00 AM at 200 Jefferson Avenue, Suite 400, Memphis, TN 38103. (Walker, Jamaal)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual with deficiencies,. Filing Fee Due $1717, Filed by EAS Graceland, LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 01/13/2021. Disclosure Statement due by 01/13/2021. (Coury, Michael)
September 15, 2020 Matrix Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of Debtor EAS Graceland, LLC. (Coury, Michael)
September 15, 2020 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(20-24484) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 36529658, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: EAS Graceland, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: EAS Graceland, LLC
Represented By: Michael P. Coury
Represented By: Ricky Hutchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Carrie Ann Rohrscheib
Represented By: Jamaal M. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?