Genesis Place, LLC
Debtor: Genesis Place, LLC
Us Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 2:2020bk24485
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: David S Kennedy
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 73 Certificate Of Compliance With Local Bankruptcy Rule 9013-1 Filed by Ricky Hutchens on behalf of Debtor Genesis Place, LLC (related document(s)#50 Application to Employ Glankler Brown PLLC as Attorneys for Debtor ). (Hutchens, Ricky)
November 10, 2020 Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#72 Objection to (related document(s): #59 Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 3007 Getwell Road, Memphis, Tennessee 38118 and certain personal property, Motion to Abandon ) Filed by Debtor Genesis Place, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Deed of Trust # 2 Exhibit 2- Assignment of Rents)) Hearing scheduled 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
November 9, 2020 Filing 72 Objection to (related document(s): #59 Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 3007 Getwell Road, Memphis, Tennessee 38118 and certain personal property Filing Fee Due $181 filed by Creditor Pangea Mortgage Capital, LLC, Motion to Abandon ) Filed by Debtor Genesis Place, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Deed of Trust #2 Exhibit 2- Assignment of Rents) (Coury, Michael)
November 9, 2020 Filing 71 The United States Trustee reports that at this time, despite diligent efforts to contact eligible holders of unsecured claims, there has not been sufficient willingness to serve on a committee of unsecured creditors in this case. Accordingly, the United States Trustee is unable to appoint a committee pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1102(a) at this time. (Walker, Jamaal)
November 9, 2020 Filing 70 The United States Trustee reports that the Meeting of Creditors required under 11 U.S.C. Section 341 has been held and conducted as scheduled. (Walker, Jamaal)
November 9, 2020 Filing 69 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Elijah Noel Jr. on behalf of City of Memphis. (Noel, Elijah)
November 9, 2020 Filing 68 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Elijah Noel Jr. on behalf of Shelby County Trustee. (Noel, Elijah)
November 8, 2020 Filing 67 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#66 Order on Motion to Borrow) Notice Date 11/08/2020. (Admin.)
November 6, 2020 Filing 66 Final Order Granting Emergency Motion For Final Order Authorizing Debtor To Obtain Secured Post-Petition Financing (Related Doc #16) (ana)
November 5, 2020 Filing 65 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#63 Order (Generic)) Notice Date 11/05/2020. (Admin.)
November 4, 2020 Filing 64 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#62 Agreed / Consent Order) Notice Date 11/04/2020. (Admin.)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Order Withdrawing Objection To Emergency Motion For Interim and Final Order Authorizing Debtor To Obtain Secured Post-Petition Financing. by Jamaal M. Walker on behalf of U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee (related document(s):#28 Objection to Motion) (ana)
November 2, 2020 Filing 62 Agreed Order Resolving Adequate Protection Assurance Of Future Performance As To Memphis Light, Gas & Water Division Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of Debtor Genesis Place, LLC (ana)
October 27, 2020 Minutes; Disposition: GRANTED. Order to be prepared by Michael Coury. (related document(s)#16 Emergency Motion to Borrow For Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Secured Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to 11 USC 105, 364(c)(3) and Granting Security Interest Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of Genesis Place, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Pro Forma Budget)). Order due by 11/10/2020. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 27, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#27 Objection to (related document(s): #15 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral) Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee) Hearing scheduled 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 27, 2020 Notice Of Continuance AND INTERIM ORDER to be submitted by Michael Coury (related document(s)#15 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of Genesis Place, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Cash Flow Pro Forma Budget)) Hearing scheduled 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 27, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#34 Objection to (related document(s): #15 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral) Filed by Creditor Pangea Mortgage Capital, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F # 7 Exhibit G # 8 Exhibit H # 9 Exhibit I # 10 Exhibit J # 11 Exhibit K # 12 Exhibit L) (Clift, R.)) Hearing scheduled 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 27, 2020 Minutes; Disposition: OVERRULED. (related document(s)#35 Objection to (related document(s): #16 Emergency Motion to Borrow For Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Secured Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to 11 USC 105, 364(c)(3) and Granting Security Interest ) Filed by Creditor Pangea Mortgage Capital, LLC (Clift, R.)) (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 25, 2020 Filing 61 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#60 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 10/25/2020. (Admin.)
October 23, 2020 Filing 60 Notice Of Hearing; (related document(s)#59 Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 3007 Getwell Road, Memphis, Tennessee 38118 and certain personal property , in addition to Motion to Abandon Filed by R. Spencer Clift III on behalf of Pangea Mortgage Capital, LLC (Clift, R.)) Hearing scheduled 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. Bar Date For Objections - 11/9/2020. (dap)
October 22, 2020 Filing 59 Motion for Relief from Stay in RE: 3007 Getwell Road, Memphis, Tennessee 38118 and certain personal property Filing Fee Due $181, in addition to Motion to Abandon Filed by R. Spencer Clift III on behalf of Pangea Mortgage Capital, LLC (Clift, R.)
October 22, 2020 Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay(20-24485) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 181.00) filing fee. Receipt number 36668871, amount $ 181.00. (U.S. Treasury)
October 20, 2020 Filing 58 Exhibit: Construction Budget Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of Debtor Genesis Place, LLC (related document(s)#16 Emergency Motion to Borrow For Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Secured Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to 11 USC 105, 364(c)(3) and Granting Security Interest). (Coury, Michael)
October 18, 2020 Filing 57 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#54 Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules) Notice Date 10/18/2020. (Admin.)
October 18, 2020 Filing 56 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#53 Interim Order) Notice Date 10/18/2020. (Admin.)
October 17, 2020 Filing 55 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#51 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 10/17/2020. (Admin.)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information (Related Doc #38) Incomplete Filings Due by 10/9/2020. (ana)
October 16, 2020 Filing 53 Second Interim Order Authorizing Emergency Motion For Entry Of Interim Order Authorizing Use Of Cash Collateral (related document(s):#15 Motion to Use Cash Collateral) (ana)
October 15, 2020 Filing 52 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#48 Notice of Documents that Remain Missing or Incomplete) Notice Date 10/15/2020. (Admin.)
October 15, 2020 Filing 51 Notice Of Hearing; (related document(s)#50 Application to Employ Glankler Brown PLLC as Attorneys for Debtor Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of Genesis Place, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael P. Coury)) Hearing scheduled 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. Bar Date For Objections - 11/9/2020. (dap)
October 14, 2020 Filing 50 Application to Employ Glankler Brown PLLC as Attorneys for Debtor Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of Genesis Place, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael P. Coury) (Coury, Michael)
October 13, 2020 Filing 49 Attachment to Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy under Chapter 11 - Form 201A Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of Debtor Genesis Place, LLC. (Coury, Michael)
October 13, 2020 Filing 48 Notice of Documents that Remain Missing or Incomplete: Voluntary Petition Attachment - Form 201A, (ana)
October 13, 2020 Minutes; Disposition: MOOT. THIS OBJECTION WAS LINKED TO THE WRONG MOTION WHEN IT WAS FILED. IT HAS SINCE BEEN CORRECTED BY THE PARTY FILER. REFER TO OBJECTIONS 27 AND 29. (related document(s)#28 Objection Filed by U.S. Trustee to (related document(s): #16 Emergency Motion to Borrow For Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Secured Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to 11 USC 105, 364(c)(3) and Granting Security Interest ) (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 13, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#16 Emergency Motion to Borrow For Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Secured Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to 11 USC 105, 364(c)(3) and Granting Security Interest Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of Genesis Place, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Pro Forma Budget)) Hearing scheduled 10/27/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 13, 2020 Notice Of Continuance AND INTERIM ORDER to be submitted by Michael Coury/Ricky Hutchens (related document(s)#15 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of Genesis Place, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Cash Flow Pro Forma Budget)) Interim Hearing scheduled 10/27/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 13, 2020 Minutes; Disposition: WITHDRAWN. Order to be prepared by Jamaal Walker. (related document(s)#29 Objection Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee (related document(s)#16 Emergency Motion to Borrow For Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Secured Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to 11 USC 105, 364(c)(3) and Granting Security Interest (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Pro Forma Budget)).) Order due by 10/27/2020. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 13, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#27 Objection to (related document(s): #15 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral) Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee) Hearing scheduled 10/27/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 13, 2020 All Completion/Missing Documents have been filed and all related deadlines have been satisfied. (ana)
October 13, 2020 Minutes; Disposition: GRANTED. Order to be prepared by Ricky Hutchens. (related document(s)#38 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules/Statements or Provide Required Information Filed by Ricky Hutchens on behalf of Genesis Place, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) Order due by 10/27/2020. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 13, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#35 Objection to (related document(s): #16 Emergency Motion to Borrow For Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Secured Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to 11 USC 105, 364(c)(3) and Granting Security Interest ) Filed by Creditor Pangea Mortgage Capital, LLC (Clift, R.)) Hearing scheduled 10/27/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 13, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#34 Objection to (related document(s): #15 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral) Filed by Creditor Pangea Mortgage Capital, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F # 7 Exhibit G # 8 Exhibit H # 9 Exhibit I # 10 Exhibit J # 11 Exhibit K # 12 Exhibit L) (Clift, R.)) Hearing scheduled 10/27/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
October 9, 2020 Filing 47 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#44 Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral) Notice Date 10/09/2020. (Admin.)
October 9, 2020 Filing 46 Exhibit: Construction Budget Filed by Ricky Hutchens on behalf of Debtor Genesis Place, LLC (related document(s)#16 Emergency Motion to Borrow For Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Secured Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to 11 USC 105, 364(c)(3) and Granting Security Interest). (Hutchens, Ricky)
October 9, 2020 Filing 45 Non-Individual List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and are Not Insiders , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual , Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D: Non-Individual Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual. , Schedule G: Non-Individual Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H: Non-Individual Codebtors , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor , Equity Security Holders , Matrix, Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of Debtor Genesis Place, LLC. (Coury, Michael)
October 7, 2020 Filing 44 Interim Order Authorizing Motion To Use Cash Collateral (Related Doc #15) (ana)
October 6, 2020 Filing 43 Exhibit: A to proposed Interim Order Authorizing Debtor's Emergency Motion for Entry of Interim Order Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral submitted for entry on 10/6/20 Filed by R. Spencer Clift III on behalf of Creditor Pangea Mortgage Capital, LLC. (Clift, R.)
October 3, 2020 Filing 42 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#40 Case Management Order) Notice Date 10/03/2020. (Admin.)
October 2, 2020 Filing 41 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#39 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 10/02/2020. (Admin.)
October 1, 2020 Filing 40 Case Management Order (ams)
September 30, 2020 Filing 39 Notice Of Hearing; (related document(s)#38 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules/Statements or Provide Required Information Filed by Ricky Hutchens on behalf of Genesis Place, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) Hearing scheduled 10/13/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. Bar Date For Objections - 10/9/2020. (dap)
September 30, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#29 Objection Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee (related document(s)#16 Emergency Motion to Borrow For Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Secured Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to 11 USC 105, 364(c)(3) and Granting Security Interest (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Pro Forma Budget)).) Hearing scheduled 10/13/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
September 30, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#28 Objection to (related document(s): #16 Emergency Motion to Borrow For Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Secured Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to 11 USC 105, 364(c)(3) and Granting Security Interest ) Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee) Hearing scheduled 10/13/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
September 30, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#35 Objection to (related document(s): #16 Emergency Motion to Borrow For Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Secured Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to 11 USC 105, 364(c)(3) and Granting Security Interest ) Filed by Creditor Pangea Mortgage Capital, LLC (Clift, R.)) Hearing scheduled 10/13/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
September 30, 2020 Minutes; Disposition: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONDUCTED. Court to prepare the order. (related document(s)#4 Order And Notice Of Case Management Conference ) (dap)
September 30, 2020 Notice Of Continuance for FINAL HEARING (related document(s)#16 Emergency Motion to Borrow For Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Secured Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to 11 USC 105, 364(c)(3) and Granting Security Interest Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of Genesis Place, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Pro Forma Budget)) FINAL Hearing scheduled 10/13/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
September 30, 2020 Notice Of Continuance for INTERIM HEARING and Interim Order to be submitted by Michael Coury (related document(s)#15 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of Genesis Place, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Cash Flow Pro Forma Budget)) Interim Hearing scheduled 10/13/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
September 30, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#34 Objection to (related document(s): #15 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral) Filed by Creditor Pangea Mortgage Capital, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F # 7 Exhibit G # 8 Exhibit H # 9 Exhibit I # 10 Exhibit J # 11 Exhibit K # 12 Exhibit L) (Clift, R.)) Hearing scheduled 10/13/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
September 30, 2020 Notice Of Continuance (related document(s)#27 Objection to (related document(s): #15 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral) Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee) Hearing scheduled 10/13/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap) Auto-docketed(CPA)
September 29, 2020 Filing 38 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules/Statements or Provide Required Information Filed by Ricky Hutchens on behalf of Genesis Place, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hutchens, Ricky)
September 29, 2020 Filing 37 Exhibit: Draft Deed of Trust Filed by Ricky Hutchens on behalf of Debtor Genesis Place, LLC (related document(s)#16 Emergency Motion to Borrow For Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Secured Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to 11 USC 105, 364(c)(3) and Granting Security Interest). (Hutchens, Ricky)
September 29, 2020 Filing 36 Exhibit: Draft Promissory Note Filed by Ricky Hutchens on behalf of Debtor Genesis Place, LLC (related document(s)#16 Emergency Motion to Borrow For Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Secured Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to 11 USC 105, 364(c)(3) and Granting Security Interest). (Hutchens, Ricky)
September 28, 2020 Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#34 Objection to (related document(s): #15 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral) Filed by Creditor Pangea Mortgage Capital, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F # 7 Exhibit G # 8 Exhibit H # 9 Exhibit I # 10 Exhibit J # 11 Exhibit K # 12 Exhibit L) (Clift, R.)) Hearing scheduled 9/30/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
September 28, 2020 Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#35 Objection to (related document(s): #16 Emergency Motion to Borrow For Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Secured Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to 11 USC 105, 364(c)(3) and Granting Security Interest ) Filed by Creditor Pangea Mortgage Capital, LLC (Clift, R.)) Hearing scheduled 9/30/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
September 28, 2020 Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#27 Objection to (related document(s): #15 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral) Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee) Hearing scheduled 9/30/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
September 28, 2020 Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#28 Objection to (related document(s): #16 Emergency Motion to Borrow For Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Secured Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to 11 USC 105, 364(c)(3) and Granting Security Interest ) Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee) Hearing scheduled 9/30/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
September 28, 2020 Update Hearing Deadlines (related document(s)#29 Objection Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee (related document(s)#16 Emergency Motion to Borrow For Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Secured Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to 11 USC 105, 364(c)(3) and Granting Security Interest (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Pro Forma Budget)).) Hearing scheduled 9/30/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
September 27, 2020 Filing 35 Objection to (related document(s): #16 Emergency Motion to Borrow For Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Secured Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to 11 USC 105, 364(c)(3) and Granting Security Interest filed by Debtor Genesis Place, LLC) Filed by Creditor Pangea Mortgage Capital, LLC (Clift, R.)
September 27, 2020 Filing 34 Objection to (related document(s): #15 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Genesis Place, LLC) Filed by Creditor Pangea Mortgage Capital, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D #5 Exhibit E #6 Exhibit F #7 Exhibit G #8 Exhibit H #9 Exhibit I #10 Exhibit J #11 Exhibit K #12 Exhibit L) (Clift, R.)
September 26, 2020 Filing 33 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#24 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 09/26/2020. (Admin.)
September 26, 2020 Filing 32 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#23 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 09/26/2020. (Admin.)
September 25, 2020 Filing 31 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#22 Order On Motion To Shorten Time) Notice Date 09/25/2020. (Admin.)
September 25, 2020 Filing 30 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#21 Order On Motion To Shorten Time) Notice Date 09/25/2020. (Admin.)
September 25, 2020 Filing 29 Objection to Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee (related document(s)#16 Emergency Motion to Borrow For Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Secured Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to 11 USC 105, 364(c)(3) and Granting Security Interest Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of Genesis Place, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Pro Forma Budget)). (Walker, Jamaal)
September 25, 2020 Filing 28 Objection to (related document(s): #16 Emergency Motion to Borrow For Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Secured Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to 11 USC 105, 364(c)(3) and Granting Security Interest filed by Debtor Genesis Place, LLC) Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee (Walker, Jamaal)
September 25, 2020 Filing 27 Objection to (related document(s): #15 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Genesis Place, LLC) Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee (Walker, Jamaal)
September 24, 2020 Filing 26 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#20 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 09/24/2020. (Admin.)
September 24, 2020 Filing 25 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#19 Notice Of Hearing) Notice Date 09/24/2020. (Admin.)
September 24, 2020 Filing 24 Notice Of Preliminary Hearing Resetting (related document(s)#16 Emergency Motion to Borrow For Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Secured Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to 11 USC 105, 364(c)(3) and Granting Security Interest Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of Genesis Place, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Pro Forma Budget)) Reset Preliminary Hearing scheduled 9/30/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
September 24, 2020 Filing 23 Notice Of Preliminary Hearing Resetting (related document(s)#15 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of Genesis Place, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Cash Flow Pro Forma Budget)) Reset Preliminary Hearing scheduled 9/30/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
September 24, 2020 Notice Of Resetting (related document(s)#4 Order And Notice Of Case Management Conference Combined with Related Orders and Notice of the Entry Thereof Status hearing to be held on 9/29/2020 at 10:00 AM By telephone, if necessary. (ana)) Reset Hearing scheduled 9/30/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order Granting Motion To Shorten Time (Related Doc #18) (ana)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order Granting Motion To Shorten Time (Related Doc #17) (ana)
September 22, 2020 Filing 20 Notice Of Preliminary Hearing; (related document(s)#16 Emergency Motion to Borrow For Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Secured Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to 11 USC 105, 364(c)(3) and Granting Security Interest Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of Genesis Place, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Pro Forma Budget)) Preliminary Hearing scheduled 9/29/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
September 22, 2020 Filing 19 Notice Of Preliminary Hearing; (related document(s)#15 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of Genesis Place, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Cash Flow Pro Forma Budget)) Preliminary Hearing scheduled 9/29/2020 at 10:00 AM, By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
September 22, 2020 Filing 18 Emergency Motion To Shorten Time For Hearing on Emergency Motion to Authorize Use of Cash Collateral; Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of Genesis Place, LLC (Coury, Michael). Related document(s) #15 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Genesis Place, LLC. Modified on 9/22/2020 (Avent, April).
September 22, 2020 Filing 17 Emergency Motion To Shorten Time For Hearing on Emergency Motion to Approve Post-petition Financing; Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of Genesis Place, LLC (Coury, Michael).Related document(s) #16 Emergency Motion to Borrow For Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Secured Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to 11 USC 105, 364(c)(3) and Granting Security Interest filed by Debtor Genesis Place, LLC. Modified on 9/22/2020 (Avent, April).
September 22, 2020 Filing 16 Emergency Motion to Borrow For Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Secured Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to 11 USC 105, 364(c)(3) and Granting Security Interest Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of Genesis Place, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pro Forma Budget) (Coury, Michael)
September 22, 2020 Filing 15 Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of Genesis Place, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Cash Flow Pro Forma Budget) (Coury, Michael)
September 21, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Ricky Hutchens on behalf of Genesis Place, LLC. (Hutchens, Ricky)
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by R. Spencer Clift III on behalf of Pangea Mortgage Capital, LLC. (Clift, R.)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#4 Order And Notice Of Case Management Conference (initial order on ch11 cases)) Notice Date 09/18/2020. (Admin.)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#2 Update Deficiency Deadlines) Notice Date 09/18/2020. (Admin.)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors (related document(s)#6 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) Notice Date 09/18/2020. (Admin.)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 As required by 28 U.S.C. Section 586(a), the United States Trustee provides notice that the Initial Debtor Interview will be held on **RESETTING** Thursday, October 1, 2020 (Telephonically) at 10:00 a.m. (LeSueur, Darlene)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of 11 U.S.C. Section 341 Metting of Creditors Telephonic Conference Filed by Jamaal M. Walker on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Walker, Jamaal)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 As required by 28 U.S.C. Section 586(a), the United States Trustee provides notice that the Initial Debtor Interview will be held on Wednesday, September 30, 2020 (Telephonically) at 10:00 a.m. (LeSueur, Darlene)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/21/2020 at 10:00 AM at Room 400, Memphis, TN. Proof of Claims due by 1/19/2021. Government Proof of Claims due by 3/15/2021. (ana)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jamaal M. Walker on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Walker, Jamaal)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order And Notice Of Case Management Conference Combined with Related Orders and Notice of the Entry Thereof Status hearing to be held on 9/29/2020 at 10:00 AM By telephone, if necessary. (ana)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Carrie Ann Rohrscheib on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Required Filing Fee and/or Deficient Filing. Deficiency Deadlines Updated to Indicate Incomplete Filings: Attachment to Ch 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Form 201A, Attorney Fee Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders, Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Statement of Financial Affairs and Debtor Declaration, Summary of Assets and Liabilities , Declaration Re: Corporation or Partnership (Form 202), Incomplete Filings Due by 9/30/2020. (ana)
September 16, 2020 Notice By The U.S. Trustee Setting The Meeting Of Creditors. Section 341 Meeting has been set on 10/21/2020 at 10:00 AM at 200 Jefferson Avenue, Suite 400, Memphis, TN 38103. (Walker, Jamaal)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual with deficiencies,. Filing Fee Due $1717, Filed by Genesis Place, LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 01/13/2021. Disclosure Statement due by 01/13/2021. (Coury, Michael)
September 15, 2020 Matrix Filed by Michael P. Coury on behalf of Debtor Genesis Place, LLC. (Coury, Michael)
September 15, 2020 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(20-24485) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 36529670, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: Genesis Place, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Genesis Place, LLC
Represented By: Michael P. Coury
Represented By: Ricky Hutchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Carrie Ann Rohrscheib
Represented By: Jamaal M. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?