CAH Acquisition Company 11, LLC v. INFLUX CAPITAL LLC
Plaintiff: CAH Acquisition Company 11, LLC
Defendant: INFLUX CAPITAL LLC
Case Number: 2:2021ap00023
Filed: March 7, 2021
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: David S Kennedy
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 Reissued Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference (related document(s)#3 Amended/Corrected Complaint (First Amended Complaint) by E. Franklin Childress Jr. on behalf of CAH Acquisition Company 11, LLC against INFLUX CAPITAL LLC. (related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff CAH Acquisition Company 11, LLC). (Childress, E.)) Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/27/2021 at 10:00 AM By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Service of Summons and Notice of Pretrial conference in an Adversary Proceeding Date Of Service: 3/10/2021 Filed by E. Franklin Childress Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff CAH Acquisition Company 11, LLC (related document(s)#3 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff CAH Acquisition Company 11, LLC). (Childress, E.)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 Amended/Corrected Complaint (First Amended Complaint) by E. Franklin Childress Jr. on behalf of CAH Acquisition Company 11, LLC against INFLUX CAPITAL LLC. (related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff CAH Acquisition Company 11, LLC). (Childress, E.)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference (related document(s)#1 Adversary case 21-00023. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by CAH Acquisition Company 11, LLC against INFLUX CAPITAL LLC. FOR AVOIDANCE AND RECOVERY OF PREFERENTIAL TRANSFERS (Childress, E.)) Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/27/2021 at 10:00 AM By telephone, if necessary. (dap)
March 7, 2021 Filing 1 Adversary case 21-00023. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by CAH Acquisition Company 11, LLC against INFLUX CAPITAL LLC. FOR AVOIDANCE AND RECOVERY OF PREFERENTIAL TRANSFERS Filing Fee Due $350 (Childress, E.)
March 7, 2021 Receipt of Complaint(# 21-00023) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A37123192, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: CAH Acquisition Company 11, LLC v. INFLUX CAPITAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAH Acquisition Company 11, LLC
Represented By: E. Franklin Childress, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INFLUX CAPITAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?