Majestic Propeties of Tennessee, LLC
Debtor: Majestic Propeties of Tennessee, LLC
Us Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 2:2021bk20594
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: M Ruthie Hagan
Referring Judge: Jennie D Latta
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2021 Filing 25 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#24 Case Management Order) Notice Date 04/04/2021. (Admin.)
April 2, 2021 Filing 24 Case Management Order (ana)
April 1, 2021 Minutes; Disposition: Case Management Order to be entered by Court. related document(s) #18 Order And Notice Of Case Management Conference Combined with Related Orders and Notice of the Entry Thereof Status hearing to be held on 4/1/2021 at 10:15 AM by telephone or videoconference, if necessary. (bkj) Auto-docketed(CPA)
March 22, 2021 REQUEST FOR CORRECTION BY FILER: (related document(s)#23 THIS ENTRY IS VOID. INCORRECT PDF ATTACHED. REQUEST FOR FIING PARTY TO FILE A NEW PLEADING. Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 122B Filed by Ted I. Jones on behalf of Debtor Majestic Propeties of Tennessee, LLC. (Jones, Ted) Modified on 3/22/2021 .) (ana)
March 19, 2021 Filing 23 THIS ENTRY IS VOID. INCORRECT PDF ATTACHED. REQUEST FOR FIING PARTY TO FILE A NEW PLEADING. Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 122B Filed by Ted I. Jones on behalf of Debtor Majestic Propeties of Tennessee, LLC. (Jones, Ted) Modified on 3/22/2021 (Avent, April).
March 19, 2021 Filing 22 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor , Equity Security Holders , Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule C , Schedule D: Non-Individual Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual. , Schedule G: Non-Individual Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H: Non-Individual Codebtors , Schedule I: Non-Individual Your Income , Schedule J: Non-Individual Your Expenses , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual , Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by Ted I. Jones on behalf of Debtor Majestic Propeties of Tennessee, LLC. (Jones, Ted)
March 14, 2021 Filing 21 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#19 Order on Motion to Extend Time) Notice Date 03/14/2021. (Admin.)
March 13, 2021 Filing 20 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#18 Order And Notice Of Case Management Conference (initial order on ch11 cases)) Notice Date 03/13/2021. (Admin.)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Granting Motion to Extend Time To Complete Filing (Related Doc #14) (ana)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order And Notice Of Case Management Conference Combined with Related Orders and Notice of the Entry Thereof Status hearing to be held on 4/1/2021 at 10:15 AM by telephone or videoconference, if necessary. (ams)
March 10, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Elijah Noel Jr. on behalf of City of Memphis. (Noel, Elijah)
March 10, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Elijah Noel Jr. on behalf of Shelby County Trustee. (Noel, Elijah)
March 10, 2021 Filing 15 As required by 28 U.S.C. Section 586(a), the United States Trustee provides notice that the Initial Debtor Interview will be held on **Resetting** Monday, March 15, 2021 (Telephonically) at 10:00 a.m. (LeSueur, Darlene)
March 10, 2021 Filing 14 Motion to Extend Time To Extend The Time To Complete Petition and Schedules Filed by Ted I. Jones on behalf of Majestic Propeties of Tennessee, LLC (Jones, Ted)
March 8, 2021 Filing 13 As required by 28 U.S.C. Section 586(a), the United States Trustee provides notice that the Initial Debtor Interview will be held on **Resetting** Wednesday, March 10, 2021 telephonically at 10:00 a.m. (LeSueur, Darlene)
March 6, 2021 Filing 12 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#10 Notice Of Judge Reassignment) Notice Date 03/06/2021. (Admin.)
March 5, 2021 Filing 11 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#9 Order of Recusal) Notice Date 03/05/2021. (Admin.)
March 4, 2021 Filing 10 Notice Of Judge Reassignment, Judge Jennie D. Latta added to case. (kec)
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 Sua Sponte Order of Case Recusal (ana)
February 26, 2021 Filing 8 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors (related document(s)#6 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) Notice Date 02/26/2021. (Admin.)
February 25, 2021 Filing 7 BNC Certificate of Mailing (related document(s)#2 Update Deficiency Deadlines) Notice Date 02/25/2021. (Admin.)
February 25, 2021 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(21-20594) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number 37087280, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
February 24, 2021 Filing 6 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/23/2021 at 03:00 PM at by telephone or videoconference, if necessary. Proof of Claims due by 6/21/2021. Government Proof of Claims due by 8/23/2021. (ana)
February 23, 2021 Filing 5 As required by 28 U.S.C. Section 586(a), the United States Trustee provides notice that the Initial Debtor Interview will be held on Thursday, March 4, 2021 telephonically at 10:00 a.m. (LeSueur, Darlene)
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of 11 U.S.C. Section 341 Meeting of Creditors Telephonic Conference Filed by Sean M. Haynes on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Haynes, Sean)
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Sean M. Haynes on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Haynes, Sean)
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Required Filing Fee and/or Deficient Filing. Deficiency Deadlines Updated to Indicate Incomplete Filings: Attorney Fee Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders, Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule I, Schedule J, Statement of Financial Affairs and Debtor Declaration, Summary of Assets and Liabilities , Declaration Re: Corporation or Partnership (Form 202), Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 122B, Incomplete Filings Due by 3/9/2021. (ana)
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual with deficiencies,. Filing Fee Due $1738, Filed by Majestic Propeties of Tennessee, LLC Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 08/23/2021. Disclosure Statement due by 08/23/2021. (Jones, Ted)
February 23, 2021 Matrix Filed by Ted I. Jones on behalf of Debtor Majestic Propeties of Tennessee, LLC. (Jones, Ted)
February 23, 2021 Notice By The U.S. Trustee Setting The Meeting Of Creditors. Section 341 Meeting has been set on 3/23/2021 at 03:00 PM at Telephonically. (Haynes, Sean)

Search for this case: Majestic Propeties of Tennessee, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Majestic Propeties of Tennessee, LLC
Represented By: Ted I. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Sean M. Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?