Hugueley v. Bell

Petitioner: Stephen Hugueley
Respondent: Ricky Bell
Miscellaneous: Kelley J. Henry
Case Number: 1:2009cv01181
Filed: August 20, 2009
Court: Tennessee Western District Court
Office: Jackson Office
County: Hardeman
Presiding Judge: J. Daniel Breen
Referring Judge: Edward G. Bryant
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2017 145 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDMENT TO ORDER DENYING PETITION, ORDER DENYING A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY AND CERTIFYING THAT AN APPEAL WOULD NOT BE TAKEN IN GOOD FAITH. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 8/9/17. (Breen, J.)
August 3, 2017 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CHANGE RESPONDENT, GRANTING RESPONDENT'S 112 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DENYING PETITION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 2254, GRANTING A LIMITED CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY, AND CERTIFYING THAT AN APPEAL WOULD BE TAKEN IN GOOD FAITH. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 8/3/17. (Breen, J.)
April 16, 2015 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING RESPONDENT'S 110 MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS I, J, & K AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER IN GOOD FAITH AND FILE A JOINT REPORT REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Chief Judge J. Daniel Breen on 4/16/15. (Breen, J.)
January 15, 2015 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY AND ABATE PROCEEDINGS 101 . Signed by Chief Judge J. Daniel Breen on 1/15/15. (Breen, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hugueley v. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stephen Hugueley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ricky Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Kelley J. Henry
Represented By: Kelley J. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?