Amalu v. LSH Transport, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Augustine C Amalu
Defendant: LSH Transport, LLC, Estate of Tony Mills, Estate of Kristi Mills, T. Marzetti, Inc., United Financial Casualty Co. d/b/a Progressive Ins. Co., Progressive Casualty Ins. Co., Trinity Insurance Services, LLC and Steve Hurt
Case Number: 1:2015cv01116
Filed: May 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Jackson Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: J. Daniel Breen
Presiding Judge: Edward G. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 510 JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 7/18/2018. (mbb)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF LSH TRANSPORT, LLC; STEVE HURT; K & S TRUCKING; AND TIM MILLS, AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF TONY R. MILLS, AS TO CROSS-CLAIM ASSERTED BY DAVID LINDSEY INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE OF KRISTI MILLS (383). Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 5/10/18. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01116-STA-egb, 1:15-cv-01117-STA-egb, 1:15-cv-01175-STA-egb, 1:15-cv-01298-STA-egb, 1:16-cv-01116-STA-egb(skc)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER AFFIRMING MAGISTRATE JUDGES DECISION. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 4/23/18. (mbm)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT STEVENS TRANSPORT TL, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT(177) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:15-cv-01116-JDB-egb; denying (163) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:15-cv-01117-JDB-egb; denying (102) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:15-cv-01175-JDB-egb; denying (61) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:15-cv-01298-JDB-egb; denying (15) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:16-cv-01116-JDB-egb. Signed by Chief Judge J. Daniel Breen on 8/26/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-01116-JDB-egb, 1:15-cv-01117-JDB-egb, 1:15-cv-01175-JDB-egb, 1:15-cv-01298-JDB-egb, 1:16-cv-01116-JDB-egb(Breen, J.)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT STEVENS TRANSPORT, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFS JAMES HARTMANN AND GLENDA HARTMANN(166) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:15-cv-01116-JDB-egb; denying (158) Motion to Dismiss in ca se 1:15-cv-01117-JDB-egb; denying (91) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:15-cv-01175-JDB-egb; denying (56) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:15-cv-01298-JDB-egb; denying (7) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:16-cv-01116-JDB-egb. Signed by Chief Judge J. Daniel Breen on 8/2/16. (Breen, J.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amalu v. LSH Transport, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Augustine C Amalu
Represented By: Matthew E. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSH Transport, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Tony Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Kristi Mills
Represented By: Charles L. Holliday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Marzetti, Inc.
Represented By: James Bennett Fox, Jr.
Represented By: Alexandra E. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Financial Casualty Co. d/b/a Progressive Ins. Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Ins. Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Insurance Services, LLC
Represented By: Brent S. Usery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?