Haltom v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Bruce Haltom
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv01197
Filed: October 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Edward G Bryant
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED #10 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND WRITTEN DISCOVERY. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 11/14/18. (skc)
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses to Complaint and Written Discovery filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: There is not a statement in the docket text of your filing indicating that a Proposed Order was submitted and to date the Court has not received a Proposed Order for your Motion. Proposed Orders MUST be e-mailed to the appropriate Judges ECF e-mail address in a Word Processing Format- NOT PDF FORMAT (e-mail addresses can be located on our website under Judges Websites and Profiles, Chambers E-mail Addresses). On future filings, you must also include a statement in the box that states Docket text-Modify as appropriate-that reads- "Proposed Order Submitted". Please e-mail the Proposed Order for your Motion to the appropriate Judge at this time. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (cdi)
November 8, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses to Complaint and Written Discovery by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Duckworth, James)
November 8, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James Douglas Duckworth on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Duckworth, James)
November 8, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher L. Vescovo on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Vescovo, Christopher)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of service as to State of TN, Dept. of Commerce. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(mbm)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (cdi)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (cdi)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (cdi)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (cdi)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (cdi)
October 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2897458), filed by Bruce Haltom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Songstad, Randall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haltom v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Haltom
Represented By: Randall N Songstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Christopher L. Vescovo
Represented By: James Douglas Duckworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?