Bernier et al v. Sam's East, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Bernier and Lisa Bernier
Defendant: Walmart, Inc. and Sam's East, Inc.
Undetermined: Kathy Blount
Case Number: 1:2018cv01231
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Edward G Bryant
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO RESET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF RESETTING #11 (Scheduling Conference reset for 2/21/2019 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson.). Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 1/16/2019. (mbb)
January 15, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference, proposed order submitted by Sam's East, Inc.. (Reedy, Brandon)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon W. Reedy on behalf of Sam's East, Inc. (Reedy, Brandon)
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2019 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (ejs)
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Sam's East, Inc. of Service of First Interrogatories and RFP (Reviere, Russell)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Sam's East, Inc..(Reviere, Russell)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (skc)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sam's East, Inc.. (Reviere, Russell)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sam's East, Inc. from Circuit Court of Madison County, case number C-18-247 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2928883), filed by Sam's East, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint)(Reviere, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernier et al v. Sam's East, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc.
Represented By: Russell E. Reviere
Represented By: Brandon W. Reedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bernier
Represented By: Jason Daniel Nowlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Bernier
Represented By: Jason Daniel Nowlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Kathy Blount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?