Sims v. Butts Foods, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Randall Sims
Defendant: Ray E. Butts, III, Butts Foods, Inc. and R.E. Butts, IV
Case Number: 1:2018cv01258
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
0 Judge: J Daniel Breen
1 Judge: Edward G Bryant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Morelli, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Morelli, Robert)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Randall Sims. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Ray E. Butts, III Wavier of Service, #2 R.E. Butts, IV Waiver of Service)(Turner, Robert)
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emmett Turner, IV on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Turner, Robert)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula Rachelle Jackson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Paula)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons Ray Butts, III, #2 Summons Ray Butts, IV)(skc)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Russ Bryant on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bryant, Joseph)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (skc)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2954506), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to be Issued for Butts Foods, Inc., #3 Summons to be Issued for Ray Butts, III, #4 Summons to be Issued for R.E. Butts, IV)(Jackson, Gordon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims v. Butts Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Sims
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Represented By: Paula Rachelle Jackson
Represented By: Robert E. Morelli, III
Represented By: Robert Emmett Turner, IV
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray E. Butts, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butts Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.E. Butts, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?