Blake et al v. Ray et al
Plaintiff: Edna Blake and Alis Blake
Defendant: Wayne Ray Feed MIll and Stephen Edward Ray
Undetermined: Linda Fulghum
Case Number: 1:2018cv02564
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Jackson Office
County: Hardeman
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Edward G Bryant
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2018 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (ejs)
August 23, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Stephen Edward Ray.(Lyons, Lewis)
August 16, 2018 NOTE to all parties: This case was incorrectly opened in the Western Division of the Western District. It was transferred to the Jackson office and the case number has been modified. Please take notice of the case number, as the only change in the number will be in the divisional code at the beginning of the case number. (Ex: 1:XX-cv-XXX or 2:XX-cv-XXXX). The old case has been closed and will contain a case flag that it is closed. Particular attention should be used when selecting the case number during CM/ECF filing of future pleading to ensure that you are filing in the correct (open) Case. The new case number is 1:18-cv-2564. Please list the correct case number on all future pleadings. (jld)
August 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
August 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (jld)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Correction to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Lyons, Lewis)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Stephen Edward Ray from Hardeman County Circuit Court, case number 2018-cv-24 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2857785), filed by Stephen Edward Ray. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Hardeman County Complaint)(Lyons, Lewis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blake et al v. Ray et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Ray Feed MIll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Edward Ray
Represented By: Lewis Wilkinson Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Blake
Represented By: Jason J. Yasinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alis Blake
Represented By: Jason J. Yasinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Linda Fulghum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?