Colas et al v. Certified Recovery Service, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Stanley Colas and Sheila Colas
Defendant: John Does 1-25 and Certified Recovery Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01020
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Edward G Bryant
2 Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Wallis, Edwin)
March 15, 2019 Filing 16 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2019 09:15 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (ejs)
March 13, 2019 Filing 15 Pursuant to Admin. Order 2019-09 Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added to case. Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant no longer assigned. (cdi)
March 12, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Certified Recovery Service, Inc.. (Stokes, Jonathan)
March 7, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Certified Recovery Service, Inc..(Stokes, Jonathan)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stanley Colas, Sheila Colas as to Certified Recovery Service, Inc.. (Saks, Yaakov)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED #8 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 2/20/19. (mbm)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Glassman on behalf of Certified Recovery Service, Inc. (Glassman, Richard)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin E. Wallis, III on behalf of Certified Recovery Service, Inc. (Wallis, Edwin)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Proposed Order Submitted) by Certified Recovery Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Certificate of Consultation)(Stokes, Jonathan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Stokes on behalf of Certified Recovery Service, Inc. (Stokes, Jonathan)
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Certified Recovery Service, Inc. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (skc)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (skc)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Certified Recovery Service, Inc., John Does 1-25 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2980152), filed by Stanley Colas, Sheila Colas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Saks, Yaakov)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colas et al v. Certified Recovery Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certified Recovery Service, Inc.
Represented By: Edwin E. Wallis, III
Represented By: Richard Glassman
Represented By: Jonathan Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Colas
Represented By: Yaakov Saks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Colas
Represented By: Yaakov Saks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?