Fincher v. Southern Crop Growers LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joel Fincher
Defendant: CGB Diversified Services, Inc., Southern Crop Growers LLC and Heartland Crop Insurance Inc.
Undetermined: Clerk Kim Kail
Case Number: 1:2019cv01031
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE WITHOUT PREJUDICE #19 . Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 4/12/19. (skc)
April 11, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3038485) by Southern Crop Growers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Shelson, James)
March 27, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF RESETTING: Scheduling Conference reset for 5/2/2019 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (mbb)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #16 MOTION TO CONTINUE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 3/27/19. (mbm)
March 26, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Continue by Joel Fincher. (Hoskins, Wendell)
March 15, 2019 Filing 15 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2019 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (ejs)
March 13, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Crop Growers LLC. (Peake, John)
March 13, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to First Amended Complaint by Southern Crop Growers LLC.(Peake, John)
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Joinder In Notice of Removal by Southern Crop Growers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing Joinder)(Peake, John)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 Pursuant to Admin. Order 2019-09 Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added to case. Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant no longer assigned. (mbm)
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by CGB Diversified Services, Inc., Heartland Crop Insurance Inc.. (Henke, W.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Heartland Crop Insurance Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CGB Diversified Services, Inc. for Heartland Crop Insurance Inc... (Henke, W.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CGB Diversified Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CGB Enterprises, Inc. for CGB Diversified Services, Inc... (Henke, W.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Kurt Henke on behalf of Heartland Crop Insurance Inc. (Henke, W.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Heartland Crop Insurance Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, of Consent and Joinder in Removal (Henke, W.)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (skc)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CGB Diversified Services, Inc. from Crockett Circuit, case number 3507 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2992111), filed by CGB Diversified Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - CSC Notice, #5 Exhibit D - Summons, #6 Exhibit E - State Court Removal Notification)(Henke, W.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fincher v. Southern Crop Growers LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CGB Diversified Services, Inc.
Represented By: W. Kurt Henke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Crop Growers LLC
Represented By: John Day Peake, III
Represented By: James W. Shelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartland Crop Insurance Inc.
Represented By: W. Kurt Henke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Fincher
Represented By: Wendell L. Hoskins, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Clerk Kim Kail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?