McGarrity v. Walmart, Inc.

Plaintiff: Marilee McGarrity
Defendant: Walmart, Inc
Not Yet Classified: Clerk Byron Maxedon
Case Number: 1:2019cv01089
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Walmart, Inc of Service of Initial Disclosures and Interrogatories and Requests for Production (Reviere, Russell)
June 18, 2019 Filing 19 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for 4/20/2020 09:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Pretrial Conference set for 4/3/2010 10:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/9/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. (ars)
June 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Marilee McGarrity Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Pre-Discovery Disclosures (Lambert, Mark)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR deadline is 9/5/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 8/12/2019. Discovery due by 2/25/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 8/12/2019. Submission of selected mediator due by 3/26/2020.Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 6/13/2019. (ars) Modified on 6/18/2019 to correct filing date (ars).
June 13, 2019 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York: Scheduling Conference held on 6/13/2019. As this is consent case, the matter is set for Jury Trial set on Monday, for 4/20/2020 09:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. A Phone Status Conference is set for 9/9/2019 10:00 AM, following the mediation to be held in August. Scheduling order will be entered as presented by counsel. (Court Reporter FTR.) (skp)
June 12, 2019 Filing 15 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/13/2019 10:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Please email the proposed joint scheduling order in the original Word format to ECF_Judge_York@tnwd.uscourts.gov as soon as possible. If you are unable to appear at this time, or if you need to make alternative arrangements, please contact the Judge's Case Manager at 731-421-9275 so we may reschedule. Please agree on a date and time with the opposing counsel before calling to facilitate the new date.Counsel should review the Court's new ADR plan, file a Stipulation, and be prepared to report the name of a mediator to the Court during the Scheduling Conference. If the parties cannot agree upon a mediator one will be appointed by the Court after the scheduling conference.PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys who wish to participate in the Scheduling Conference MUST have filed a Notice of Appearance with the Court PRIOR to the date of the Conference and have full knowledge of the case. Note: Text only (ars)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE, CONSENT, AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 6/12/19. (skc)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Walmart, Inc of Parties' Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge (Reedy, Brandon)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Reedy, Brandon)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon W. Reedy on behalf of Walmart, Inc (Reedy, Brandon)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/13/2019 09:15 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (ejs)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Walmart, Inc of Service of Defendant's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production (Reviere, Russell)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Walmart, Inc of Defendant's Response to Requests for Admissions (Reviere, Russell)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Walmart, Inc.(Reviere, Russell)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (skc)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc.. (Reviere, Russell)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart, Inc. from McNairy County Circuit, case number 19-CV-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3062927), filed by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint and Summons)(Reviere, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGarrity v. Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc
Represented By: Russell E. Reviere
Represented By: Brandon W. Reedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Clerk Byron Maxedon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilee McGarrity
Represented By: Mark Anthony Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?