Barnes et al v. Cooper Hotel Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Calandra Coleman, Marcus Duncan, Sedarius Morris, Christopher Barnes and Jameir Neely
Defendant: Cooper Hotel Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01124
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Daniel Breen
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Christopher Barnes, Calandra Coleman, Marcus Duncan, Sedarius Morris, Jameir Neely of Filing First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 First Amended Complaint)(Rickard, Caraline)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Proposed Discovery Plan. (Giles, Shayna)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER:Scheduling Conference set for 08/15/2019, 10:00 A.M. CT in Courtroom #3, 3rd Floor, Jackson Federal Courthouse, before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Please email the proposed joint scheduling order in the original Word format to ECF_Judge_York@tnwd.uscourts.gov one week prior to the scheduling conference. All Scheduling Conferences will be done in person before the Court. If you are unable to appear at this time, or if you need to make alternative arrangements, please contact the Judge's Case Manager at 731-421-9275 so we may reschedule. Please agree on a date and time with the opposing counsel before calling to facilitate the new date. ** REMINDER: FRCP 26(f) requires a 26(f) meeting to be held at least 21 days before a scheduling conference and the Rule 26(f) report to be filed with the court at least fourteen days before the scheduling conference. This case has been assigned to the Standard track. Please use the Standard Track Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order at http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LR162_Standard.doc Note that this is a NEW scheduling order template on which all scheduling orders will now be based. Counsel should review the Court's new ADR plan, file a Stipulation, and be prepared to report the name of a mediator to the Court during the Scheduling Conference. If the parties cannot agree upon a mediator one will be appointed by the Court after the scheduling conference.PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys who wish to participate in the Scheduling Conference MUST have filed a Notice of Appearance with the Court PRIOR to the date of the Conference and have full knowledge of the case. Note: Text only (ars)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED #10 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 6/25/19. (mbm)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion for Extension (Proposed Order Submitted) by Cooper Hotel Services, Inc.. (Davis, Angie)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Shayna Giles on behalf of Cooper Hotel Services, Inc. (Giles, Shayna)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Angie C. Davis on behalf of Cooper Hotel Services, Inc. (Davis, Angie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Caraline Elizabeth Rickard on behalf of Christopher Barnes, Calandra Coleman, Marcus Duncan, Sedarius Morris, Jameir Neely (Rickard, Caraline)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Cooper Hotel Services, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (cdi)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (cdi)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (cdi)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (cdi)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (cdi)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cooper Hotel Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3090439), filed by Jameir Neely, Marcus Duncan, Calandra Coleman, Christopher Barnes, Sedarius Morris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Gilbert, Justin) Modified on 6/13/2019 to correct spelling of Plaintiff Coleman's first name to match spelling on complaint (cdi).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes et al v. Cooper Hotel Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calandra Coleman
Represented By: Caraline Elizabeth Rickard
Represented By: Justin Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Duncan
Represented By: Caraline Elizabeth Rickard
Represented By: Justin Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sedarius Morris
Represented By: Caraline Elizabeth Rickard
Represented By: Justin Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Barnes
Represented By: Caraline Elizabeth Rickard
Represented By: Justin Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jameir Neely
Represented By: Caraline Elizabeth Rickard
Represented By: Justin Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Hotel Services, Inc.
Represented By: Shayna Giles
Represented By: Angie C. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?