Morrison v. City of Humboldt, Tennessee et al
Plaintiff: John Morrison
Defendant: Don Graves, Donna Johnson, Leon McNeal, Marvin Sikes and City of Humboldt, Tennessee
Case Number: 1:2019cv01154
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Burleson, John)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 8/8/19. (mbm)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer proposed order submitted by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Moton for Extension of Time, #2 Certificate of Consultation)(Burleson, John)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Robert Courtner on behalf of All Defendants (Courtner, Matthew)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Burleson on behalf of City of Humboldt, Tennessee, Don Graves, Donna Johnson, Leon McNeal, Marvin Sikes (Burleson, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons Graves, #2 Summons Johnson, #3 Summons McNeal, #4 Summons Sikes)(mbm)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (mbm)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Humboldt, Tennessee, Don Graves, Donna Johnson, Leon McNeal, Marvin Sikes (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3127221), filed by John Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons - City of Humboldt, #3 Summons Summons - Mayor Sikes, #4 Summons Summons - Graves, #5 Summons Summons - Johnson, #6 Summons Summons - McNeal)(Weinman, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrison v. City of Humboldt, Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Graves
Represented By: Matthew Robert Courtner
Represented By: John D. Burleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Johnson
Represented By: Matthew Robert Courtner
Represented By: John D. Burleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon McNeal
Represented By: Matthew Robert Courtner
Represented By: John D. Burleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Sikes
Represented By: Matthew Robert Courtner
Represented By: John D. Burleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Humboldt, Tennessee
Represented By: Matthew Robert Courtner
Represented By: John D. Burleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Morrison
Represented By: Michael L. Weinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?