Cagle v. Specialty Retailers, Inc., d/b/a Peebles, a Texas Corporation
Plaintiff: Lynne Cagle
Defendant: Specialty Retailers, Inc., d/b/a Peebles, a Texas Corporation
Not Yet Classified: Mike Wilson
Case Number: 1:2019cv01180
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Daniel Breen
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for 11/30/2020 09:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 2 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. Pretrial Conference set for 11/25/2020 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 2 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. Motions in Limine, Proposed Jury Instructions and Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/18/2020. (ejc)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #10 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 9/27/2019. Note: text only, no image associated with entry. (ars)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR deadline is 12/19/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 12/2/2019. Discovery due by 6/22/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 12/2/2019. Motions due by 7/23/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 9/26/2019. (ars) (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/26/2019) (ars).
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York: Scheduling Conference held on 9/26/2019. Present were attys Waters and Davison. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter FTR.) (ars)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to File Standard Tract Scheduling Order by Specialty Retailers, Inc., d/b/a Peebles, a Texas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Standard Track Scheduling Order)(Davidson, Lucas)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Specialty Retailers, Inc., d/b/a Peebles, a Texas Corporation Of Substitution of Counsel (Davidson, Lucas)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Specialty Retailers, Inc., d/b/a Peebles, a Texas Corporation.(Changas, David)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER:Scheduling Conference set for 09/26/2019, 10:00 A.M. CT in Courtroom #3, 3rd Floor, Jackson Federal Courthouse, before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Please email the proposed joint scheduling order in the original Word format to ECF_Judge_York@tnwd.uscourts.gov one week prior to the scheduling conference. All Scheduling Conferences will be done in person before the Court. If you are unable to appear at this time, or if you need to make alternative arrangements, please contact the Judge's Case Manager at 731-421-9275 so we may reschedule. Please agree on a date and time with the opposing counsel before calling to facilitate the new date. ** REMINDER: FRCP 26(f) requires a 26(f) meeting to be held at least 21 days before a scheduling conference and the Rule 26(f) report to be filed with the court at least fourteen days before the scheduling conference. This case has been assigned to the Standard track. Please use the Standard Track Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order at http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LR162_Standard.doc Note that this is a NEW scheduling order template on which all scheduling orders will now be based. Counsel should review the Court's new ADR plan, file a Stipulation, and be prepared to report the name of a mediator to the Court during the Scheduling Conference. If the parties cannot agree upon a mediator one will be appointed by the Court after the scheduling conference.PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys who wish to participate in the Scheduling Conference MUST have filed a Notice of Appearance with the Court PRIOR to the date of the Conference and have full knowledge of the case. Note: Text only (ars)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Specialty Retailers, Inc., d/b/a Peebles, a Texas Corporation. (Changas, David)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (skc)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Specialty Retailers, Inc., d/b/a Peebles, a Texas Corporation from Henry County Circuit Court, case number 4040 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3150912), filed by Specialty Retailers, Inc., d/b/a Peebles, a Texas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit B. Notices to Clerk and Plaintiff's Counsel, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Changas, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cagle v. Specialty Retailers, Inc., d/b/a Peebles, a Texas Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynne Cagle
Represented By: Blair P. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialty Retailers, Inc., d/b/a Peebles, a Texas Corporation
Represented By: David A. Changas
Represented By: Lucas Allen Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Mike Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?