Newbill v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Plaintiff: Sherry Newbill
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Not Yet Classified: Cynthia Flowers
Case Number: 1:2019cv01185
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Daniel Breen
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for 12/14/2020 09:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 2 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2020 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 2 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. Motions in Limine, Proposed Jury Instructions and Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/2/2020. (ejc)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Sherry Newbill Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Yasinsky, Jason)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR deadline is 12/19/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 11/25/2019. Discovery due by 7/22/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 11/25/2019. Motions due by 8/21/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 10/3/2019. (ars)
October 3, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York: Scheduling Conference held on 10/3/2019. Present were attys Yasinksy and Watson. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter FTR.) (ars)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Consent MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2019 10:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 9/24/2019. (ars)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Watson, Cameron)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Watson, Cameron)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER:Scheduling Conference set for 09/26/2019, 10:00 A.M. CT in Courtroom #3, 3rd Floor, Jackson Federal Courthouse, before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Please email the proposed joint scheduling order in the original Word format to ECF_Judge_York@tnwd.uscourts.gov one week prior to the scheduling conference. All Scheduling Conferences will be done in person before the Court. If you are unable to appear at this time, or if you need to make alternative arrangements, please contact the Judge's Case Manager at 731-421-9275 so we may reschedule. Please agree on a date and time with the opposing counsel before calling to facilitate the new date. ** REMINDER: FRCP 26(f) requires a 26(f) meeting to be held before a scheduling conference and the Rule 26(f) report to be filed with the court at least fourteen days before the scheduling conference. This case has been assigned to the Standard track. Please use the Standard Track Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order at http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LR162_Standard.doc Note that this is a NEW scheduling order template on which all scheduling orders will now be based. Counsel should review the Court's new ADR plan, file a Stipulation, and be prepared to report the name of a mediator to the Court during the Scheduling Conference. If the parties cannot agree upon a mediator one will be appointed by the Court after the scheduling conference.PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys who wish to participate in the Scheduling Conference MUST have filed a Notice of Appearance with the Court PRIOR to the date of the Conference and have full knowledge of the case. Note: Text only (ars)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.(Watson, Cameron)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (mbm)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC from Circuit Court of Gibson County, Tennessee for the Twenty Eighth Judicial District at Trenton, case number 9039 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3153435), filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Summons & Complaint)(Watson, Cameron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newbill v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Newbill
Represented By: Jason J. Yasinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Cynthia Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Cameron M. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?