Farmer v. Phillips et al
Plaintiff: Keith Lemont Farmer
Defendant: Jonathan P. Lebo, Tony Parker, Natasha Miller, Stacy Leake, Debra Johnson, Alan Petty, David B. Abel, Arthur Lynce, Cpl. Perkin, Jason Rogers, Shawn Phillips, Johnthan Michael H. Vernon, Sgt. Hagen and William Byron Lee
Case Number: 1:2019cv01211
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: James D Todd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION requesting record from USDC at Chattanooga and to add unto the record by Keith Lemont Farmer. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(mbm)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of filing by Trust Fund Dept. of WTSP. (Attachments: #1 USDC Order, #2 envelope)(mbm)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #2 LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND ASSESSING $350 FILING FEE IN ACCORDANCE WITH PLRA. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 10/2/19. (cdi)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION : Amendment & Supplemental re #1 Pro Se Complaint by Keith Lemont Farmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Summons for Auetha Gaynor, #3 Summons for Patrick Hankins, #4 Summons for Mr. Lee, #5 Summons for Mr. William Byron Lee, #6 envelope-front, #7 envelope-back)(cdi)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Keith Lemont Farmer. (Attachments: #1 Trust Fund, #2 Envelope)(skc)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1)-(2) OR PAY THE $400 CIVIL FILING FEE. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 9/19/19. (mbm)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Hearing Conducted at Jail use of Video Communicator by Keith Lemont Farmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(csf)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Keith Lemont Farmer. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Trust Fund Certification Balance)(csf)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights Under 42 U.S.C. 1983 filed by Keith Lemont Farmer against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Relief (Continued), #2 Sworn Affidavit by Keith Lemont Farmer, #3 Sworn Affidavit by Corthian Pewitte, #4 Rule 7, #5 TCA 41-21-806, #6 Rule 3 Commencing an Action, #7 Schedule of Fees, #8 Summonses, #9 41-21-806 Review by grievance committee, #10 Exhibit 1 Disciplinary Report 4/18/19, #11 Exhibit 2 Disciplinary Report Original Copy, #12 Exhibit 6 Inappropriate Grievance, #13 Exhibit 6 Part II Inappropriate Grievance, #14 Exhibit 6 Part III Inappropriate Grievance, #15 Exhibit 6 Part II Inappropriate Grievance, #16 Exhibit A Disciplinary Report 11/29/18, #17 Exhibit A1 Motion to Subpoena, #18 Exhibit A3 Information Request, #19 Plaintiff Declaration, #20 Exhibit 2 Disciplinary Proof, #21 Exhibit A5 Memo 4/26/19 from Warden, #22 Envelope (Left Side and Right Side), #23 Magistrate Card)(csf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2019: #24 Judge's Card) (skc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmer v. Phillips et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan P. Lebo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natasha Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Leake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Petty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Lynce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpl. Perkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnthan Michael H. Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Byron Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Lemont Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?