Rhyan v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Plaintiff: Terry Rhyan
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv01247
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terry Rhyan. All Defendants. U.S. Attorney General served on 10/28/2019. U.S. Attorney served on 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney General, #2 Summons US Attorney)(Beal, Lena)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons US Atty Gen, #2 Summons US Atty)(skc)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #2 Motion to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 10/18/19. (skc)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (mbm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2019: #1 Magistrate Card) (csf).
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis proposed order submitted by Terry Rhyan. (Beal, Lena)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, filed by Terry Rhyan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons William Barr, #3 Summons Commissioner, #4 Summons Michael Dunavant)(Beal, Lena)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhyan v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Rhyan
Represented By: Lena D. Beal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?