Transou v. Crowell
Petitioner: 132974 Mack Transou
Respondent: Georgia Crowell
Case Number: 1:2019cv01258
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Jackson Office
Presiding Judge: J Daniel Breen
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00010. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Case was originally opened in WD/TN Eastern Division as case #1:18cv-1240 JDB and was transferred to ED/TN on 12/31/2018.) (cdi).
November 8, 2019 Case transferred to District of Western TN. Certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (ABF) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Petitioner leave to amend his petition in this action such that his amended petition [Doc. 21] is the operative petition in this case. Respondents motion to dismiss and to transfer the petition #17 is GRANTED in part to the extent that Petitioners claims for habeas corpus relief arising out of his 1999 conviction as a habitual motor vehicle offender are DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and the Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer the remainder of this action back to the Eastern Division of the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee. Also, the Clerk is DIRECTED to close the file.. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 11/8/19. (c/m to Mack Transou132974, N.E.C.X., P.O. Box 5000, Mountain City, TN 37683) (ABF) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION as set forth in following order. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 11/8/19. (c/m to Mack Transou #132974, N.E.C.X., P.O. Box 5000, Mountain City, TN 37683)(ABF) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin no longer assigned to case Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 11/4/2019. (RET) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. Magistrate Judge M Clifton L Corker no longer assigned to case per SO 19-13. (KMK) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 23 Letter from Mack Transou regarding status. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Copy of docket sheet and Response, Doc. 22, mailed to Mack Transou) (AMP) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition to #21 Amended Petition. (Douglas, Richard) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Mack Transou. (Attachments: #1 Other Exhibits, #2 Other Envelope)(ABF) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 20 Letter from Mack Transou (ABF) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #18 Motion for access to the law library. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 5/9/19. (c/m to Mack Transou #132974, N.E.C.X., P.O. Box 5000, Mountain City, TN 37683) (ABF) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for access to Law Library by Mack Transou. (ABF) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus or in the Alternative to Transfer the Petition by Georgia Crowell. (Douglas, Richard) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF FILING w/certificate of service and INDEX OF RECORD of Rule 5 materials submitted by Attorney General containing 7 volumes of transcript. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Technical Record on Direct Appeal, #2 Exhibit Brief of Appellant on Direct Appeal, #3 Exhibit Brief of State on Direct Appeal, #4 Exhibit Opinion of the Tennessee Court of Criminal Appeals on Direct Appeal, #5 Exhibit Judgment of Tennessee Court of Criminal Appeals on Direct Appeal, #6 Exhibit Application for Permission to Appeal to Tennessee Supreme Court on Direct Appeal, #7 Exhibit Tennessee Supreme Court order Denying Application for Permission to Appeal on Direct Appeal)(Douglas, Richard) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondent shall have up to and including April 12, 2019 to file a response. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 3/26/19. (c/m to Mack Transou #132974, N.E.C.X., P.O. Box 5000, Mountain City, TN 37683) (ABF) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Georgia Crowell. (Douglas, Richard) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Mack Transou: Since it does not plainly appear from the face of the petition that it should be summarily dismissed, Respondent is hereby ORDERED to answer or otherwise respond to the petition within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 2/13/19. (c/m to Mack Transou #132974, N.E.C.X., P.O. Box 5000, Mountain City, TN 37683) (ABF) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal Attorney Nicholas S Bolduc terminated. (Douglas, Richard) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (copy mailed to Mack Transou at NECX) (KMK, ) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 Case electronically transferred in from the Western District of Tennessee; Case WD/TN Case Number 1:18-cv-01240. [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 12/31/18. (mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 1/16/2019.] [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Inmate Trust Fund Affidavit filed by by Mack Transou. (Attachments: #1 balance sheet, #2 envelope)(skc) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 1/16/2019.] [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of filing Circuit Court Order by Mack Transou. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 envelope)(mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 1/16/2019.] [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 12/13/18. (mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 1/16/2019.] [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing by Mack Transou. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(skc) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 1/16/2019.] [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Scott Bolduc on behalf of Georgia Crowell (Bolduc, Nicholas) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 1/16/2019.] [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 1/16/2019.] [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mack Transou. (Attachments: #1 Trust Fund info., #2 envelope)(mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 1/16/2019.] [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 PRO SE 2254 Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in State custody against Georgia Crowell, filed by Mack Transou. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Relief, #2 Circuit Court Order Denying Motion for Interlocutory Appeal, #3 Supreme Court Order, #4 Circuit Court Violation Order, #5 Circuit Court State's Response to Motion to Dismiss, #6 Circuit Court Order Dismissing Motion, #7 eTomis TN sentences, #8 Circuit Court Motion for Correction, #9 Circuit Court Order Revoking Def's Probation, #10 Madison Co. Jail Records Dept jail credit, #11 Westlaw - Court of Crim. Appeals Opinion, #12 Supreme Court - Laney v. State of TN, #13 envelope, #14 judge's card)(mbm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 1/16/2019.] [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 11/8/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Transou v. Crowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Georgia Crowell
Represented By: Nicholas S. Bolduc
Represented By: Richard Davison Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 132974 Mack Transou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?