Affordable Construction Services Inc. v. Church Mutual Insurance Company Foundation
Plaintiff: Affordable Construction Services Inc.
Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Company Foundation
Case Number: 1:2019cv01288
Filed: December 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE from State of TN Dept. of Commerce & Ins.' having been served on behalf of Church Mut. Ins. Co. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(mbm)
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, documents #8 & #9 , First MOTION to Extend Deadline to take remaining depositions filed by Affordable Construction Services Inc. and Notice (Other) filed by Affordable Construction Services Inc., has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Your filings do not appear to be styled for Our Court. Please review your document and file any corrections. Further, it appears that your Notice is a proposed Order and should not be filed in CM-ECF. Proposed Orders MUST be e-mailed to the appropriate Judge's ECF e-mail address in Word Format- NOT PDF FORMAT (e-mail addresses can be located on our website under E-mail Contacts). Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (skc)
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Affordable Construction Services Inc. Extend Deadline (Songstad, Randall)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION to Extend Deadline to take remaining depositions by Affordable Construction Services Inc.. (Songstad, Randall)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Church Mutual Insurance Company Foundation. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (mbm)
December 9, 2019 Civil Filing fee $ 400 paid, receipt number ATNWDC-3233360. (Songstad, Randall)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint filed by Affordable Construction Services Inc. has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: You did not submit payment for the filing fee. Please do so at this time by using the event code, "Pay Civil Filing Fee".Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (skc)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (skc)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Church Mutual Insurance Company Foundation, filed by Affordable Construction Services Inc..(Songstad, Randall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Affordable Construction Services Inc. v. Church Mutual Insurance Company Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Affordable Construction Services Inc.
Represented By: Randall N Songstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Company Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?