Carter et al v. Haywood County, Tennessee et al
Plaintiff: Tiffay King Carter, as Next Friened of E.R.A.C., minor, Tiffany King Carter, as Next Friend of R.J.G.C, III, Tiffany King Carter, as personal representative of Roy Caston Carter, Jr., Deceased and Tiffany King Carter
Defendant: Haywood County, Tennessee, Officer Jane Doe, Billy Sheriff Garrett, Jr., Darren W Jenkins, Cedric Tyus, Mark Covington, Haywood County Sheriff's Department, Lt. Tonya Fisher, Barry Brownsville Police Department Chief Diebold, William Mayor, Rawls and JOHN DOE-1
Not Classified By Court: Mary Bond Lonon
Case Number: 1:2019cv01295
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 14 JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 1/15/2020. (mbb)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #11 MOTION TO REMAND OF DEFENDANT HAYWOOD COUNTY, TENNESSEE, SHERIFF BILLY GARRETT, JR., TONYA FISHER, AND CEDRICK TYUS. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 1/15/2020. (mbm)
January 15, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand proposed order submitted filed by Barry Brownsville Police Department Chief Diebold, Mark Covington, Darren W Jenkins, William Mayor, Rawls. (Conder, Milton)
January 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand proposed order submitted by Tonya Fisher, Haywood County, Tennessee, Billy Sheriff Garrett, Jr., Cedric Tyus. (Tilly, Nathan)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Daniel Tilly on behalf of Tonya Fisher, Haywood County, Tennessee, Billy Sheriff Garrett, Jr., Cedric Tyus (Tilly, Nathan)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James I. Pentecost on behalf of Tonya Fisher, Haywood County, Tennessee, Billy Sheriff Garrett, Jr., Cedric Tyus (Pentecost, James)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Milton Dale Conder, Jr on behalf of Barry Brownsville Police Department Chief Diebold, Mark Covington, Darren W Jenkins, William Mayor, Rawls (Conder, Milton)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Correction to #2 Notice of Correction . (Conder, Milton)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Correction to #1 Notice of Removal, Adding Complete Complaint. (Conder, Milton)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (skc)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by William Mayor, Rawls, Darren W Jenkins, Mark Covington, Barry Brownsville Police Department Chief Diebold from Haywood County Circuit Court, case number 4585 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3243294), filed by William Mayor, Rawls, Darren W Jenkins, Mark Covington, Barry Brownsville Police Department Chief Diebold. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conder, Milton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter et al v. Haywood County, Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haywood County, Tennessee
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan Daniel Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Sheriff Garrett, Jr.
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan Daniel Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren W Jenkins
Represented By: Milton Dale Conder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedric Tyus
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan Daniel Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Covington
Represented By: Milton Dale Conder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haywood County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Tonya Fisher
Represented By: James I. Pentecost
Represented By: Nathan Daniel Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Brownsville Police Department Chief Diebold
Represented By: Milton Dale Conder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Mayor, Rawls
Represented By: Milton Dale Conder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE-1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffay King Carter, as Next Friened of E.R.A.C., minor
Represented By: W. Ray Glasgow
Represented By: Timothy J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany King Carter, as Next Friend of R.J.G.C, III
Represented By: W. Ray Glasgow
Represented By: Timothy J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany King Carter, as personal representative of Roy Caston Carter, Jr., Deceased
Represented By: W. Ray Glasgow
Represented By: Timothy J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany King Carter
Represented By: W. Ray Glasgow
Represented By: Timothy J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Mary Bond Lonon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?